EP0657936 - Tunnel diode and memory device comprising the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1995/24] | Tunnel diode with several permanent switching states | ||
[1999/44] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.08.2002 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.08.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 24.09.2008 [2008/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [2008/39] |
Former [2001/41] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | ||
Former [1995/24] | For all designated states PHILIPS ELECTRONICS N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 NL-5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wolf, Ronald Martin c/o Int. Octrooibureau B.V., Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
Blom, Paulus Wilhelmus Maria c/o Int. Octrooibureau B.V., Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | 03 /
Krijn, Marcellinus Petrus Carolus Michael c/o Int. Octrooibureau B.V., Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [1995/24] | Representative(s) | Duijvestijn, Adrianus Johannes, et al Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2002/18] | Duijvestijn, Adrianus Johannes, et al Internationaal Octrooibureau B.V., Prof. Holstlaan 6 5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | ||
Former [1998/12] | Smeets, Eugenius Theodorus J. M., et al INTERNATIONAAL OCTROOIBUREAU B.V., Prof. Holstlaan 6 5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | ||
Former [1995/24] | Tangena, Antonius Gerardus INTERNATIONAAL OCTROOIBUREAU B.V., Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 94203528.8 | 05.12.1994 | [1995/24] | Priority number, date | BE19930001369 | 10.12.1993 Original published format: BE 9301369 | [1995/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0657936 | Date: | 14.06.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0657936 | Date: | 10.10.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.01.1995 | Classification | IPC: | H01L29/88, H01L27/115, H01L45/00 | [1999/44] | CPC: |
H01L29/88 (EP,KR,US);
G11C11/22 (EP,KR,US);
G11C11/38 (EP,KR,US);
G11C11/5657 (EP,KR,US);
H01L28/55 (EP,KR,US);
H01L29/0895 (EP,US);
H01L29/51 (EP,KR,US);
H10B69/00 (EP,KR,US);
H10N70/00 (US);
|
Former IPC [1995/24] | H01L27/115, H01L29/92, H01L27/10, G11C11/22 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1995/24] | Title | German: | Tunneldiode und Speicheranordnung mit derselben | [1999/44] | English: | Tunnel diode and memory device comprising the same | [1999/44] | French: | Diode tunnel et dispositif de mémoire la comprenant | [1999/44] |
Former [1995/24] | Tunneldiode mit mehreren stabilen Schaltzuständen | ||
Former [1995/24] | Tunnel diode with several permanent switching states | ||
Former [1995/24] | Diode tunnel présentant plusieurs états de commutation permanents | Examination procedure | 14.12.1995 | Examination requested [1996/06] | 09.10.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.01.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.11.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 06.03.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.06.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 18.06.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.07.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.01.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.01.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.01.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.01.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 10.10.2001 | NL | 10.10.2001 | [2008/05] |
Former [2003/08] | NL | 10.10.2001 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5206788 (LARSON WILLIAM [US], et al); |