EP0658326 - Display cabinet or rack [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.04.1999 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.04.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.06.1999 [1999/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROTHMANS SERVICES B.V. Drentestraat 21 1083 HK Amsterdam / NL | [1997/05] |
Former [1995/25] | For all designated states ROTHMANS TOBACCO COMPANY B.V. Drentestraat, 19 NL-1083 HK Amsterdam / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Coster, Kees Rijksstraatweg 19 NL-2121 AA Bennebroek / NL | 02 /
Wolswinkel, Bertus Ekris 45 NL-3931 PV Woudenberg / NL | [1995/25] | Representative(s) | Hoorweg, Petrus Nicolaas Bureau Ottelohe J.R. B.V.V.A. Louiza-Marialei 8 2018 Antwerpen / BE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/46] | Hoorweg, Petrus Nicolaas Bureau Ottelohe J.R. B.V.V.A., Louiza-Marialei 8 2018 Antwerpen / BE | ||
Former [1995/25] | Ottelohe, Jozef René Bureau Ottelohe J.R. b.v.b.a. Fruithoflaan, 105 Bus 3 B-2600 Antwerpen (Berchem) / BE | Application number, filing date | 94203538.7 | 06.12.1994 | [1995/25] | Priority number, date | BE19930001404 | 17.12.1993 Original published format: BE 9301404 | [1995/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0658326 | Date: | 21.06.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0658326 | Date: | 10.06.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.03.1995 | Classification | IPC: | A47F5/00, A47B88/18, A47B57/04 | [1995/25] | CPC: |
A47B57/04 (EP);
A47B88/60 (EP);
A47F5/0037 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, NL [1995/25] | Title | German: | Schaukasten oder Schaugestell | [1995/25] | English: | Display cabinet or rack | [1995/25] | French: | Armoire ou casier d'exposition | [1995/25] | Examination procedure | 29.09.1995 | Examination requested [1995/48] | 23.01.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.04.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.10.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 15.12.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.03.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 02.03.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.03.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.11.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.12.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2953254 (SCHNELLE) [A] 1,4 * figures 1,3,10,11; claim 1 * * column 3, line 53 - line 65 *; | [A]US1453598 (OBELE) [A] 1 * figures 1,2; claim 1 *; | [A]FR1315124 (DUBOIS) |