EP0616310 - Rectangular foldable sheet with diagonal folding lines for large area images [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.10.1999 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 30.01.2008 [2008/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Schumacher, Frank Osnabrücker Strasse 6 D-10589 Berlin / DE | [1994/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1994/38] | Application number, filing date | 94250066.1 | 14.03.1994 | [1994/38] | Priority number, date | DE19934308308 | 16.03.1993 Original published format: DE 4308308 | [1994/38] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0616310 | Date: | 21.09.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0616310 | Date: | 16.12.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.07.1994 | Classification | IPC: | G09B29/04, B42D15/00 | [1994/38] | CPC: |
G09B29/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1994/38] | Title | German: | Rechteckiger Faltbogen mit Diagonalfalzen für grossflächige Abbildungen | [1994/38] | English: | Rectangular foldable sheet with diagonal folding lines for large area images | [1994/38] | French: | Feuille pliable rectangulaire avec lignes de pliage diagonales pour dessins à grande surface | [1994/38] | Examination procedure | 07.03.1995 | Examination requested [1995/19] | 27.02.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 03.09.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.12.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 01.12.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.09.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.09.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.09.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.1996 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   27.09.1996 | 31.03.1997 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   30.09.1997 | 31.03.1998 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   30.09.1998 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 16.12.1998 | IT | 16.12.1998 | NL | 16.12.1998 | AT | 14.03.1999 | SE | 16.03.1999 | BE | 31.03.1999 | CH | 31.03.1999 | LI | 31.03.1999 | [2008/05] |
Former [2003/08] | ES | 16.12.1998 | |
NL | 16.12.1998 | ||
AT | 14.03.1999 | ||
SE | 16.03.1999 | ||
BE | 31.03.1999 | ||
CH | 31.03.1999 | ||
LI | 31.03.1999 | ||
Former [2002/26] | ES | 16.12.1998 | |
AT | 14.03.1999 | ||
SE | 16.03.1999 | ||
BE | 31.03.1999 | ||
CH | 31.03.1999 | ||
LI | 31.03.1999 | ||
Former [2001/23] | AT | 14.03.1999 | |
SE | 16.03.1999 | ||
BE | 31.03.1999 | ||
CH | 31.03.1999 | ||
LI | 31.03.1999 | ||
Former [2001/08] | AT | 14.03.1999 | |
BE | 31.03.1999 | ||
CH | 31.03.1999 | ||
LI | 31.03.1999 | ||
Former [2000/52] | BE | 31.03.1999 | |
CH | 31.03.1999 | ||
LI | 31.03.1999 | ||
Former [2000/23] | BE | 31.03.1999 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DK64650 (ARENTZEN) [A] 1* Figuren 1 - 5 *; | [A]US2333569 (GAUNTLETT HIGGINS CHARLES) [A] 1 * gesamtes Dokument *; | [A]DE856964 (NILS GUSTAF HOEGLANDER, et al) [A] 1 * Seite 1, Zeile 4 - Seite 2, Zeile 63; Figuren 1 - 3 *; | [A]DE3208120 (WAKAMATSU SHIGEMI DIPL ING) [A] 1 * Zusammenfassung; Seite 5, Zeile 19 - Seite 7, Zeile 7; Figuren 1 - 6 *; | [A]US4502711 (MUTH STEPHAN R W [US]) [A] 1 * Zusammenfassung; Spalte 2, Zeile 22 - Spalte 3, Zeile 43; Figuren 1 - 4 *; | [A]FR2628361 (HARMEL BERNARD [FR]) [A] 1 * Zusammenfassung; Seite 3, Zeile 7 - Seite 8, Zeile 13; Figuren 1 - 4 *; | [PX]DE9303061U (SCHUMACHER) [PX] 1,4 * Seite 7, Zeile 11 - Seite 8, Zeile 9; Ansprüche 1, 3; Figuren 1 - 5 * |