EP0625669 - Device for heating pipe surfaces [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.09.1996 Database last updated on 10.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.1996 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.10.1996 [1996/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE KENDALL COMPANY 15 Hampshire Street Mansfield Massachusetts 02048 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1994/47] | For all designated states THE KENDALL COMPANY 15 Hampshire Street Mansfield, Massachusetts 02048 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dempster III, William A. 18 Chautaugua Avenue Nashua, NH 03060 / US | [1994/47] | Representative(s) | Uexküll & Stolberg Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Beselerstrasse 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/47] | UEXKÜLL & STOLBERG Patentanwälte Beselerstrasse 4 D-22607 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 94250105.7 | 21.04.1994 | [1994/47] | Priority number, date | US19930062913 | 18.05.1993 Original published format: US 62913 | [1994/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0625669 | Date: | 23.11.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.06.1994 | Classification | IPC: | F16L53/00, F27D23/00 | [1994/47] | CPC: |
F27D99/0006 (EP);
F16L53/35 (EP);
H05B3/06 (EP);
H05B3/22 (EP);
F27D2099/0008 (EP);
F27D2099/0058 (EP);
F27M2001/1556 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1994/47] | Title | German: | Heizunganlage für Rohroberflächen | [1994/47] | English: | Device for heating pipe surfaces | [1994/47] | French: | Installation pour le chauffage des surfaces de tubes | [1994/47] | File destroyed: | 20.04.2002 | Examination procedure | 04.01.1995 | Examination requested [1995/10] | 25.09.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.04.1996 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1996/44] | 05.06.1996 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1996/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.03.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]SU761781 ; | [X]DD149319 ; | [X]CH208911 (KAUFMANN HEINRICH [CH]) [X] 1,4 *The whole patent *; | [X]US2426976 (TAULMAN FRANCIS L) [X] 1,4 * figure -; claim - *; | [X]FR2559874 (BASTIDE ALBERT [FR]) [X] 1-5 *The whole document*; | [XA]FR2628506 (THOMAS JACQUES [FR], et al) [X] 1,2,4 * claim 1 * * claim 4 * [A] 5 | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, Database accession no. 81-E7974D, & SU761781 A 19800101 (WATE) [X] 1,2,5 * abstract * | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, Database accession no. 81-71822D, & DD149319 A 19810708 (B.SIMMEN) [X] 1,5 * abstract * |