EP0628462 - Closeable sliding wall with locking device particularly for high speed freight wagon [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.04.1998 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.04.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 10.06.1998 [1998/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states INSTITUT FÜR SCHIENENFAHRZEUGE GmbH Adlergestell 598 12527 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/50] | For all designated states INSTITUT FÜR SCHIENENFAHRZEUGE GmbH Adlergestell 598 D-12527 Berlin / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Marek, Hanko, Dr.-Ing. Rüdickenstrasse 18 D-13053 Berlin / DE | 02 /
Franke, Erwin Emrichstrasse 32 D-12587 Berlin / DE | [1994/50] | Representative(s) | Köhler, Reimund Patentanwalt Uhlandallee 74 15732 Eichwalde / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/50] | Köhler, Reimund Patentanwalt, Uhlandallee 74 D-15732 Eichwalde / DE | Application number, filing date | 94250142.0 | 02.06.1994 | [1994/50] | Priority number, date | DE19934319984 | 11.06.1993 Original published format: DE 4319984 | [1994/50] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0628462 | Date: | 14.12.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0628462 | Date: | 18.06.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.09.1994 | Classification | IPC: | B61D19/00, B60J5/06, E05B65/38, E05B47/00 | [1994/50] | CPC: |
E05B47/0012 (EP);
B60J5/062 (EP);
B61D19/00 (EP);
E05B77/50 (EP);
E05B83/02 (EP);
E05B2047/0023 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, ES, FR, IT, NL [1994/50] | Title | German: | Schiebewand-Verschlussklappe mit Verriegelungseinrichtung, insbesondere für Hochgeschwindigkeitsgüterwagen | [1994/50] | English: | Closeable sliding wall with locking device particularly for high speed freight wagon | [1994/50] | French: | Panneau coulissant de fermeture avec dispositif de verrouillage en particulier pour wagon de marchandises à haute vitesse | [1994/50] | Examination procedure | 22.05.1995 | Examination requested [1995/29] | 05.12.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 20.12.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.01.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 07.01.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.03.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.06.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.04.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]DE2849516 (WAGGONFABRIK UERDINGEN AG) [AD] 1 * page 8, paragraph L - page 9, paragraph 1 *; | [A]FR433334 (A. SPERLICH) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]FR2333923 (ARN. KIEKERT SOHNE); | [A]US1327079 (G. BOWDEN); | [A]AT315903B (WAGGON UNION GMBH) |