blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0644102

EP0644102 - Process and device for guiding a road vehicle particularly in narrow traffic areas [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  19.01.2001
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip28.12.2007Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 30.01.2008  [2008/05]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Kroll Spezialfahrzeuge GmbH
Otto-Franke Strasse 77-97
12489 Berlin / DE
[1999/32]
Former [1995/12]For all designated states
KROLL FAHRZEUGBAU UMWELTTECHNIK GmbH
Otto-Franke-Strasse 77-97
D-12489 Berlin / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Füssl, Heinrich
Nibelungenstrasse 61
D46537 Dinslaken / DE
[1995/12]
Representative(s)Erich, Dieter
Patentanwalt August-Bebel-Ring 36
15751 Niederlehme bei Berlin / DE
[N/P]
Former [1995/12]Erich, Dieter
Patentanwalt August-Bebel-Ring 36
D-15751 Niederlehme bei Berlin / DE
Application number, filing date94250213.927.08.1994
[1995/12]
Priority number, dateDE1993433228720.09.1993         Original published format: DE 4332287
DE1994441679006.05.1994         Original published format: DE 4416790
[1995/12]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0644102
Date:22.03.1995
Language:DE
[1995/12]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0644102
Date:22.03.2000
Language:DE
[2000/12]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP30.01.1995
ClassificationIPC:B62D7/15, E01H1/00
[1995/12]
CPC:
E01H1/08 (EP,US); B62D7/142 (EP,US); B62D7/148 (EP,US);
E01H1/00 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesBE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL [1995/12]
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Einrichtung zum Führen eines Strassenfahrzeuges, vorzugsweise in engen Verkehrsflächen[1995/12]
English:Process and device for guiding a road vehicle particularly in narrow traffic areas[1995/12]
French:Procédé et dispositif pour diriger un véhicule routier en particulier dans des aires de circulation étroites[1995/12]
Examination procedure21.09.1995Examination requested  [1995/47]
23.09.1996Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
19.03.1997Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.10.1997Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
27.01.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.08.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
02.10.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.03.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
02.09.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
02.12.1999Fee for grant paid
02.12.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)23.12.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2001/10]
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.09.1996Renewal fee patent year 03
29.08.1997Renewal fee patent year 04
28.08.1998Renewal fee patent year 05
30.08.1999Renewal fee patent year 06
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipES22.03.2000
IT22.03.2000
NL22.03.2000
DK22.06.2000
BE31.08.2000
[2008/05]
Former [2003/45]ES22.03.2000
NL22.03.2000
DK22.06.2000
BE31.08.2000
Former [2003/08]ES22.03.2000
NL22.03.2000
BE31.08.2000
Former [2002/26]ES22.03.2000
BE31.08.2000
Former [2002/02]BE31.08.2000
Documents cited:Search[XA]JPH01273770  ;
 [XA]JPH02254061  ;
 [A]JPH02106473  ;
 [A]EP0291844  (DULEVO SPA [IT]);
 [A]EP0463310  (BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AG [DE]) [A] 8,13 * the whole document *;
 [A]DE4302527  (MAZDA MOTOR [JP])
 [XA]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19900125), vol. 14, no. 42, Database accession no. (M - 0925), & JP01273770 A 19891101 (ISUZU MOTORS LTD) [X] 1-7,9,12,14,15 * abstract * [A] 8,16
 [XA]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19901226), vol. 14, no. 583, Database accession no. (M - 1064), & JP02254061 A 19901012 (MAZDA MOTOR CORP) [X] 1,2,5-7,9,12 * abstract * [A] 8
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19900709), vol. 14, no. 319, Database accession no. (M - 0996), & JP02106473 A 19900418 (ISUZU MOTORS LTD) [A] * abstract *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.