EP0607035 - A spark plug voltage detector for use in internal combustion engines [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.02.1998 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.02.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 25.03.1998 [1998/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NGK SPARK PLUG CO., LTD. 14-ban, 18-gou Takatsuji-cho Mizuho-Ku Nagoya-shi / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1994/29] | For all designated states NGK SPARK PLUG CO., LTD 14-ban, 18-gou Takatsuji-cho Mizuho-Ku Nagoya-shi / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Miyata, Shigeru, c/o NGK Spark Plug Co., Ltd. 14-ban 18-gou, Takatsuji-cho, Mizuho-ku Nagoya-shi / JP | 02 /
Kondo, Noriaki, c/o NGK Spark Plug Co., Ltd. 14-ban 18-gou, Takatsuji-cho, Mizuho-ku Nagoya-shi / JP | [1994/29] | Representative(s) | Senior, Alan Murray J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1995/01] | Senior, Alan Murray J.A. KEMP & CO., 14 South Square, Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | ||
Former [1994/29] | Senior, Alan Murray J.A. KEMP & CO., 14 South Square, Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | Application number, filing date | 94300215.4 | 12.01.1994 | [1994/29] | Priority number, date | JP19930003340 | 12.01.1993 Original published format: JP 334093 | [1994/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0607035 | Date: | 20.07.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/29] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0607035 | Date: | 12.04.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0607035 | Date: | 02.04.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.02.1995 | Classification | IPC: | F02P17/00, G01R31/00 | [1995/15] | CPC: |
F02P17/12 (EP,US);
G01R15/16 (EP,US);
F02P2017/006 (EP,US);
F02P2017/123 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1994/29] | F02P17/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1994/29] | Title | German: | Zündkerzenspannungsdetektor verwendbar für innere Brennkraftmaschinen | [1994/29] | English: | A spark plug voltage detector for use in internal combustion engines | [1994/29] | French: | Détecteur de la tension d'une bougie d'allumage utilisé pour moteurs à combustion interne | [1994/29] | Examination procedure | 21.07.1995 | Examination requested [1995/38] | 24.04.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.06.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.07.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 02.10.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.12.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 23.12.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.01.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.01.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.01.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH04370372 ; | [A]EP0032647 (RENAULT [FR]) [A] 1,2 * abstract *; | [A]GB2116329 (DAIMLER BENZ AG) [A] 1,2 * figures 4,10 *; | [A]US4758791 (TEDESCHI RINALDO R [US], et al) [A] 1* abstract *; | [A]EP0508804 (NGK SPARK PLUG CO [JP]) [A] 1-7,9 * figures 6-10,12-15 *; | [PA]EP0544548 (NGK SPARK PLUG CO [JP]) [PA] 1-9 * abstract *; | US5317267 [ ] (MIYATA SHIGERU [JP], et al) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19930519), vol. 017, no. 252, Database accession no. (M - 1412), & JP04370372 A 19921222 (NGK SPARK PLUG CO LTD) [A] 1-7,9 * abstract * |