EP0608070 - "p-Methylenedioxyphenyl propionitrile derivatives, process for producing same, intermediates used in said process and organoleptic uses of said derivatives and intermediates [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.02.1998 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.02.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 25.03.1998 [1998/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states INTERNATIONAL FLAVORS & FRAGRANCES INC. 521 West 57th Street New York, NY 10019 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1994/30] | For all designated states INTERNATIONAL FLAVORS & FRAGRANCES INC. 521 West 57th Street New York New York 10019 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Narula, Anubhav P.S. 52 Cresci Boulevard, Hazlet County of Monmouth, New Jersey 07701 / US | 02 /
de Virgilio, John J. 253 Clubhouse Drive Middletown New Jersey 07748 / US | 03 /
Beck, Charles E.J. 10 Beekman Road, Summit County of Union, New Jersey 07901 / US | 04 /
Hanna, Marie R. 40 Highland Avenue, Keyport County of Monmouth, New Jersey 07735 / US | 05 /
van Elst, Jan T. Soesdijkseweg Noord 472 NL-3723 HM Bilthoven, Prov. Utrecht / NL | [1997/14] |
Former [1994/31] | 01 /
Narula, Anubhav P.S. 52 Cresci Boulevard, Hazlet County of Monmouth, New Jersey 07701 / US | ||
02 /
de Virgillo, John J. 253 Clubhouse Drive Middletown New Jersey 07748 / US | |||
03 /
Beck, Charles E.J. 10 Beekman Road, Summit County of Union, New Jersey 07901 / US | |||
04 /
Hanna, Marei R. 40 Highland Avenue, Keyport County of Monmouth, New Jersey 07735 / US | |||
05 /
van Elst, Jan T. Soesdijkseweg Noord 472 NL-3723 HM Bilthoven, Prov. Utrecht / NL | |||
Former [1994/30] | 01 /
Narula, Anubhav P.S. 52 Cresci Boulevard, Hazlet County of Monmouth, New Jersey 07701 / US | ||
02 /
de Virgillo, John J. 49 Glenmary Avenue, Red Bank County of Monmouth, New Jersey 07701 / US | |||
03 /
Beck, Charles E.J. 10 Beekman Road, Summit County of Union, New Jersey 07901 / US | |||
04 /
Hanna, Marei R. 40 Highland Avenue, Keyport County of Monmouth, New Jersey 07735 / US | |||
05 /
van Elst, Jan T. Soesdijkseweg Noord 472 NL-3723 HM Bilthoven, Prov. Utrecht / NL | Representative(s) | Brown, John D., et al Boehmert & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/30] | Brown, John David, et al FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Franz-Joseph-Strasse 38 D-80801 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 94300221.2 | 12.01.1994 | [1994/30] | Priority number, date | US19930006605 | 21.01.1993 Original published format: US 6605 | [1994/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0608070 | Date: | 27.07.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0608070 | Date: | 02.04.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.05.1994 | Classification | IPC: | C07D317/60, C07D317/58, C11B9/00 | [1994/30] | CPC: |
C07D317/60 (EP,US);
C07D317/58 (EP,US);
C11B9/0076 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, LI, NL [1994/30] | Title | German: | Derivate des p-Methylendioxyphenyl propionitrils, Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung, in diesem Verfahren eingesetzte Zwischenprokukte und organoleptische Anwendungen dieser Derivate und der Zwischenprodukte | [1994/30] | English: | "p-Methylenedioxyphenyl propionitrile derivatives, process for producing same, intermediates used in said process and organoleptic uses of said derivatives and intermediates | [1994/30] | French: | Dérivés de p-méthylènedioxyphényl propionitrile, procédé de leur préparation, composés intermédiaires utilisés dans ce procédé et utilisations organolepliques de ces dérivés et composés intermédiaires | [1994/30] | Examination procedure | 25.01.1995 | Examination requested [1995/13] | 15.05.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 19.08.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.11.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 18.11.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.01.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.01.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.01.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | DE | 03.07.1997 | [1998/03] | Documents cited: | Search | [PX]US5274133 (NARULA ANUBHAV P S [US], et al) [PX] 1-13 * column W *; | [DA]US5143899 (NARULA ANUBHAV P S [US], et al) [DA] 1-13 * column W *; | [A]EP0395982 (BASF AG [DE]) [A] 1-13 * example 7; claim - * | Examination | WO9218494 |