EP0608116 - Multiple compressor in a single shell [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.09.1995 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.02.1996 | Renewal fee | Applicant(s) | For all designated states COPELAND CORPORATION 1675 W Campbell Road Sidney Ohio 45365-0669 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1994/30] | For all designated states COPELAND CORPORATION 1675 W Campbell Road Sidney Ohio 45365-0669 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fogt, James Franklin 2427 Aldrin Drive Sidney, Ohio 45365 / US | 02 /
Caillat, Jean-Luc 7001 Settlement Way Dayton, Ohio 45414 / US | [1994/30] | Representative(s) | Price, Nigel John King J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1994/30] | Price, Nigel John King J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | Application number, filing date | 94300372.3 | 19.01.1994 | [1994/30] | Priority number, date | US19930009305 | 22.01.1993 Original published format: US 9305 | [1994/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0608116 | Date: | 27.07.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.04.1994 | Classification | IPC: | F04B41/06, F04B39/12 | [1994/30] | CPC: |
F04B41/06 (EP,US);
F04C18/02 (KR);
F04C23/008 (EP,US);
Y10S417/902 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR [1994/30] | Title | German: | Mehrfach-Kompressor in einem einzigen Gehäuse | [1994/30] | English: | Multiple compressor in a single shell | [1994/30] | French: | Compresseur multiple dans une enceinte unique | [1994/30] | File destroyed: | 08.08.2001 | Examination procedure | 28.01.1995 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1995/44] | 06.06.1995 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1995/44] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US4105374 (SCHARF PHILIP H); | [X]US4205537 (DUBBERLEY CHARLES A [US]) [X] 1,2,4-9,13-16 * column 2, line 40 - column 4, line 14; figure - *; | [A]US4252506 (HANNIBAL BILLY B) [A] 1,19 * column 3, line 48 - line 51; figure - *; | [X]US4277955 (PARKER SIDNEY A) [X] 1,2,6; | [AD]US4396360 (ELSON JOHN P) [AD] 1 * column A; figure - * * column A; figure - *; | [AD]US5102316 (CAILLAT JEAN-LUC [US], et al) [AD] 18 * column A; figure - * |