EP0609016 - Apparatus for providing services prior to call completion in a telecommunication system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1994/31] | Apparatus and method for providing services prior to call completion in a telecommunication system | ||
[1998/37] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.07.1999 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.07.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 01.09.1999 [1999/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AT&T Corp. 32 Avenue of the Americas New York, NY 10013-2412 / US | [1994/40] |
Former [1994/31] | For all designated states AT&T Corp. 32 Avenue of the Americas New York, NY 10013-2412 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Buttitta, Anthony 3106 North Neva Avenue Chicago, Illinois 60634 / US | 02 /
Duesing, Eric Alan 5830 S. Walnut Avenue, Apt. 1B Downers Grove, Illinois 60516 / US | 03 /
Kalbow, Wayne Ronald 23W234 Westchester Court Glen Ellyn, Illinois 60137 / US | 04 /
Rosstedt, Mark Ogden 1446 White Spruce Drive Toms River, New Jersey 08753 / US | 05 /
Tsai, Liane Toy 2S464 Bancroft Court Glen Ellyn, Illinois 60137 / US | [1994/31] | Representative(s) | Watts, Christopher Malcolm Kelway, et al Lucent Technologies (UK) Ltd, 5 Mornington Road Woodford Green Essex, IG8 0TU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1994/31] | Watts, Christopher Malcolm Kelway, Dr., et al AT&T (UK) Ltd. 5, Mornington Road Woodford Green Essex, IG8 0TU / GB | Application number, filing date | 94300408.5 | 19.01.1994 | [1994/31] | Priority number, date | US19930010950 | 29.01.1993 Original published format: US 10950 | [1994/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0609016 | Date: | 03.08.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0609016 | Date: | 09.09.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.06.1994 | Classification | IPC: | H04M3/38, H04M3/42, H04M3/54, H04Q3/545 | [1998/37] | CPC: |
H04M3/54 (EP,US);
H04M3/4228 (EP,US);
H04M3/436 (EP,US);
H04Q3/0029 (EP,US);
H04M1/57 (EP,US);
H04M15/00 (EP,US);
H04M3/487 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [1994/31] | H04M3/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1994/31] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Anbieten von Diensten vor der Rufbeendigung in einem Telekommunikationssystem | [1998/37] | English: | Apparatus for providing services prior to call completion in a telecommunication system | [1998/37] | French: | Dispositif pour fournir des services avant la terminaison d'appel dans un système de télécommunication | [1998/37] |
Former [1994/31] | Vorrichtung und Verfahren zum Anbieten von Diensten vor der Rufbeendigung in einem Telekommunikationssystem | ||
Former [1994/31] | Apparatus and method for providing services prior to call completion in a telecommunication system | ||
Former [1994/31] | Dispositif et méthode pour fournir des services avant la terminaison d'appel dans un système de télécommunication | Examination procedure | 19.01.1995 | Examination requested [1995/12] | 19.11.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 12.03.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.05.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 14.05.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.06.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.01.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.01.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.01.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4959855 (DAUDELIN ABRAHAM N [US]) [A] 1; | [A]US5099509 (MORGANSTEIN SANFORD J [US], et al)[A] 1 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN [A] 1 |