EP0611050 - Polyol compositions and polyisocyanates for use in the preparation of polyurethanes [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1994/33] | Novel di- and polyamino compounds for use in the preparation of polyurethanes | ||
[1997/25] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.04.1998 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.04.1998 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 10.06.1998 [1998/24] | 24.04.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 10.06.1998 [1998/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states IMPERIAL CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES PLC Imperial Chemical House, Millbank London SW1P 3JF / GB | [1994/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Carter, Steve 2, Dawes Heath Road Thundersley, Essex SS7 3UT / GB | 02 /
van Essche, Gonda Tessenstraat 1B - 28 B-3000 Leuven / BE | [1994/33] | Representative(s) | Swinnen, Anne-Marie, et al Intellectual Property Department Huntsman Polyurethanes Everslaan 45 3078 Everberg / BE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/33] | Swinnen, Anne-Marie, et al Intellectual Property Department ICI Polyurethanes Everslaan 45 B-3078 Everberg / BE | Application number, filing date | 94300435.8 | 20.01.1994 | [1994/33] | Priority number, date | GB19930002418 | 08.02.1993 Original published format: GB 9302418 | [1994/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0611050 | Date: | 17.08.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0611050 | Date: | 18.06.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.06.1994 | Classification | IPC: | C07C217/84, C07C265/12, C07C217/50, C08G18/77 | [1994/33] | CPC: |
C08G18/771 (EP,KR,US);
C07C217/84 (EP,KR,US);
C07C265/12 (EP,KR,US);
C08G18/5033 (EP,KR,US);
C08G65/2624 (EP,KR,US);
C08G65/2639 (EP,KR,US);
C07C2601/14 (EP,KR,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL, PT [1994/33] | Title | German: | Polyol-Zusammensetzungen und Polyisocynate sowie ihre Verwendung zur Herstellung von Polyurethanen | [1997/25] | English: | Polyol compositions and polyisocyanates for use in the preparation of polyurethanes | [1997/25] | French: | Polyol compositions et polyisocynates et leur utilisation pour la préparation de polyurethanes | [1997/25] |
Former [1994/33] | Di- und Polyamino-Verbindungen und ihre Verwendung zur Herstellung von Polyurethanen | ||
Former [1994/33] | Novel di- and polyamino compounds for use in the preparation of polyurethanes | ||
Former [1994/33] | Di- et polyamino composés et leur utilisation pour la préparation de polyurethanes | Examination procedure | 05.01.1995 | Examination requested [1995/10] | 04.04.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.06.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.08.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 06.12.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.03.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 03.03.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.03.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.12.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.12.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | PT | 18.09.1997 | [1998/24] | Documents cited: | Search | JPH02144149 [ ] (UBE INDUSTRIES); | [AD]DE2904124 (HOECHST AG) [AD] 1,2 * page 4, line 9 - line 14; claim 2 *; | SU598877 [ ] (KEMEROWSKIJ NII CHIM PROMY [SU]); | [A]GB2068379 (MONSANTO CO) [A] 1,2,4 * claim - * | [X] - NISHIHIRA K ET AL., "Regeneration of platinum group-deposited catalysts", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19901126), vol. 113, no. 22, Database accession no. 193912 [X] 1 * abstract * | [A] - "Alkylenation reaction of mono- and polyphenols. VII. Methylenation of phenols", NIPPON KAGAKU KAISHI (NKAKB8); 75; (2); PP.331-3 [A] 1-3 *Abstract*; page 331 * | [A] - "Synthesis and characterization of formal-group-containing diisocyanates and polyimides therefrom", J. APPL. POLYM. SCI. (JAPNAB,00218995); 92; VOL.45 (8); PP.1335-40 [A] 1,2 * page 1335 - page 1336 * | [AD] - GUDALINA N V ET AL., "Preparation of bis(4-aminophenoxy)methane, monomer for thermally stable polyamides", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19781002), vol. 89, no. 14, Database accession no. 110765 [AD] 1,2 * abstract * | [A] - OSTROVSKAYA V M ET AL., "Chromogenic coronads. I. C-arylcrown-formazans of do-, tri-, tetra-, penta-, hexa-, hepta-, and nonadecyne", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19900507), vol. 112, no. 19, Database accession no. 178929 [A] 1,2 * abstract * | [ ] - ZH. ORG. KHIM. (ZORKAE,05147492); 89; VOL.25 (8); PP.1753-8 |