EP0612653 - Winching device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.04.1997 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.04.1997 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.05.1997 [1997/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Metallifacture Limited Mansfield Road Redhill Nottingham NG5 8PY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1994/35] | For all designated states Metallifacture Limited Mansfield Road Redhill Nottingham NG5 8PY / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Parvinmehr, Hossein 3 Chevin Vale Duffield, Derbyshire DE3 4DT / GB | [1994/35] | Representative(s) | MacGregor, Gordon, et al Eric Potter Clarkson LLP Park View House 58 The Ropewalk Nottingham NG1 5DD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1994/35] | MacGregor, Gordon, et al ERIC POTTER CLARKSON St. Mary's Court St. Mary's Gate Nottingham, NG1 1LE / GB | Application number, filing date | 94300609.8 | 27.01.1994 | [1994/35] | Priority number, date | GB19930002002 | 02.02.1993 Original published format: GB 9302002 | [1994/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0612653 | Date: | 31.08.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.04.1994 | Classification | IPC: | B62D43/04 | [1994/35] | CPC: |
B62D43/045 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, SE [1994/35] | Title | German: | Winde | [1994/35] | English: | Winching device | [1994/35] | French: | Treuil | [1994/35] | Examination procedure | 23.02.1995 | Examination requested [1995/17] | 27.06.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.11.1996 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1997/21] | 06.12.1996 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1997/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.03.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.1996 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   29.03.1996 | 31.01.1997 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]GB2253198 (FORD MOTOR COMPANY LTD.) [X] 1-6 * page 8, line 7 - line 19; figure 1 * [A] 7; | [XA]EP0501644 (FORD MOTOR COMPANY LTD.) [X] 1,2,4-6 * column 4, line 20 - line 33; figures 2,4-6 * [A] 7 |