EP0610035 - System for electronically printing plural-color tamper-resistant documents [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.07.2000 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.07.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 06.09.2000 [2000/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Xerox Corporation Xerox Square Rochester New York 14644 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1999/38] | For all designated states XEROX CORPORATION Xerox Square Rochester, New York 14644 / US | ||
Former [1994/32] | For all designated states XEROX CORPORATION Xerox Square Rochester New York 14644 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Heckman, Dean A. 2467 Maple Avenue Palmyra, New York 14522 / US | 02 /
Tuttle, Steven R. 2464 Browncroft Boulevard Rochester, New York 14625 / US | 03 /
Qureshi, Irshad H. 40 Delemere Boulevard Fairport, New York 14450 / US | [1994/32] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/29] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [1997/06] | Hill, Cecilia Ann, et al Rank Xerox Ltd Patent Department Parkway Marlow Buckinghamshire SL7 1YL / GB | ||
Former [1994/32] | Hill, Cecilia Ann, et al Rank Xerox Ltd Patent Department Parkway Marlow Buckinghamshire SL7 1YL / GB | Application number, filing date | 94300641.1 | 28.01.1994 | [1994/32] | Priority number, date | US19930014474 | 05.02.1993 Original published format: US 14474 | [1994/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0610035 | Date: | 10.08.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/32] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0610035 | Date: | 15.03.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0610035 | Date: | 22.09.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.01.1995 | Classification | IPC: | H04N1/46, G03G15/01, G03G21/00, B44F1/12 | [1994/32] | CPC: |
B41M3/14 (EP,US);
G03G15/011 (EP,US);
G03G21/04 (EP,US);
H04N1/00883 (EP,US);
H04N2201/327 (EP,US);
H04N2201/3271 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1994/32] | Title | German: | System zum elektronischen Drucken fälschungssicherer Mehrfarbdokumente | [1998/47] | English: | System for electronically printing plural-color tamper-resistant documents | [1994/32] | French: | Système de copiage électronique pour des documents en plusieurs couleurs, difficile à imiter | [1994/32] |
Former [1994/32] | System zum elektronischen Kopieren fälschungssicherer Mehrfarbdokumente | Examination procedure | 15.09.1995 | Examination requested [1995/45] | 16.04.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.08.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.11.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 25.03.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.07.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 05.07.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.06.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.01.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.01.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.02.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.02.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0522827 (STANDARD REGISTER CO [US]) [X] 1-3,8,9; | [YA]US4579370 (CORWIN THOMAS R [US], et al) [Y] 1-5 [A] 7,9; | [YA]US5060980 (JOHNSON WALTER A L [US], et al) [Y] 1-4 [A] 7; | [Y]US5178418 (MERRY TREVOR [CA], et al) [Y] 1-5; | [Y]US4903048 (HARRINGTON STEVEN J [US]) [Y] 1-3,5; | [DA]US3675948 (WICKER RALPH C) [DA] 1-4,7 |