blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0610071

EP0610071 - Electrochemical cells using a polymer electrolyte [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  03.11.2000
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip03.11.2000No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 20.12.2000 [2000/51]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
EVEREADY BATTERY COMPANY, INC.
Checkerboard Square St. Louis
Missouri 63164 / US
[N/P]
Former [1994/32]For all designated states
EVEREADY BATTERY COMPANY, INC.
Checkerboard Square
St. Louis Missouri 63164 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Bailey, John C
23447 Emmons Road Columbia Station
Ohio 44028 / US
[1994/32]
Representative(s)Lord, Hilton David, et al
Marks & Clerk LLP
90 Long Acre
London WC2E 9RA / GB
[N/P]
Former [1997/27]Lord, Hilton David, et al
MARKS & CLERK, 57-60 Lincoln's Inn Fields
London WC2A 3LS / GB
Former [1994/32]Harrison, Susan Joan, et al
MARKS & CLERK, 57-60 Lincoln's Inn Fields
London WC2A 3LS / GB
Application number, filing date94300753.401.02.1994
[1994/32]
Priority number, dateUS1993001268905.02.1993         Original published format: US 12689
[1994/32]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0610071
Date:10.08.1994
Language:EN
[1994/32]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0610071
Date:05.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/01]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP09.06.1994
ClassificationIPC:H01M4/62, H01M10/40
[1994/32]
CPC:
H01M10/05 (EP,US); H01M10/052 (EP,US); H01M10/0565 (EP,US);
H01M10/058 (EP,US); H01M4/13 (EP,US); H01M4/131 (EP,US);
H01M4/139 (EP,US); H01M4/5815 (EP,US); H01M4/62 (EP,US);
H01M4/621 (EP,US); H01M4/622 (EP,US); H01M10/0587 (EP,US);
H01M4/136 (EP,US); H01M6/181 (EP,US); H01M6/188 (EP,US);
H01M6/30 (EP,US); Y02E60/10 (EP); Y10T29/49108 (EP,US) (-)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [1994/32]
TitleGerman:Polymerelektrolyt enthaltende elektrochemische Zellen[1994/32]
English:Electrochemical cells using a polymer electrolyte[1994/32]
French:Eléments électrochimiques à électrolyte polymère[1994/32]
Examination procedure29.11.1994Examination requested  [1995/04]
16.11.1995Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
24.07.1996Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
02.10.1996Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.12.1996Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
13.06.1997Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.03.1998Date of oral proceedings
08.04.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
08.04.1998Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
05.06.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.10.1998Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No)
29.04.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval)
19.05.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
10.08.1999Fee for grant paid
10.08.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP99108134.0  / EP0933828
Opposition(s)06.10.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2000/51]
Request for further processing for:02.10.1996Request for further processing filed
02.10.1996Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
21.10.1996Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.06.1996Renewal fee patent year 03
17.01.1997Renewal fee patent year 04
26.01.1998Renewal fee patent year 05
25.01.1999Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
29.02.199603   M06   Fee paid on   20.06.1996
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]GB2018015  (UNION CARBIDE CORP);
 [XY]EP0318161  (MHB JOINT VENTURE [US]);
 [Y]US4902589  (DAHN JEFFERY R [CA], et al);
 [X]EP0378123  (HITACHI MAXELL [JP]);
 [DX]EP0396324  (MHB JOINT VENTURE [US])
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.