EP0611100 - Circuit for measuring the output power from an amplifier [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 11.01.2003 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.01.2003 | Withdrawal of application | published on 26.02.2003 [2003/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nokia Corporation Keilalahdentie 4 02150 Espoo / FI | [2002/11] |
Former [1997/47] | For all designated states NOKIA MOBILE PHONES LTD. Keilalahdentie 4 02150 Espoo / FI | ||
Former [1994/33] | For all designated states NOKIA MOBILE PHONES LTD. P.O. Box 86 SF-24101 Salo / FI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kukkonen, Osmo Ilomaenkatu 15 AS 4 FIN-24100 Salo / FI | [1994/33] | Representative(s) | Lind, Robert Nokia Mobile Phones Ltd., Patent Department, P.O. Box 226 00045 Nokia Group / FI | [N/P] |
Former [1997/47] | Lind, Robert Nokia Mobile Phones Ltd., Patent Department, P.O. Box 100 00045 Nokia Group / FI | ||
Former [1994/33] | Frain, Timothy John Patent Department Nokia Mobile Phones St Georges Court St Georges Road Camberley, Surrey GU15 3QZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 94300792.2 | 02.02.1994 | [1994/33] | Priority number, date | FI19930000632 | 12.02.1993 Original published format: FI 930632 | [1994/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0611100 | Date: | 17.08.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.05.1994 | Classification | IPC: | H03G3/20, H03G3/30 | [1994/33] | CPC: |
H03G3/3042 (EP,US);
G01R21/12 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, SE [1994/33] | Title | German: | Schaltung zur Messung der Ausgangsleistung eines Verstärkers | [1994/33] | English: | Circuit for measuring the output power from an amplifier | [1994/33] | French: | Circuit de mesure de puissance de sortie d'un amplificateur | [1994/33] | Examination procedure | 17.02.1995 | Examination requested [1995/16] | 23.06.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.08.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.08.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.11.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.03.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.09.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.12.2002 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2003/09] | 17.12.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.02.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.02.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.02.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.02.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 15.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 13.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0509733 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]) [Y] 1-5 * column 4, line 47 - column 5, line 15; figure 2 *; | [Y]JPH04219001 ; | [A]EP0524806 (NOKIA MOBILE PHONES LTD [FI]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]JPS59207750 | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19921208), vol. 16, no. 567, Database accession no. (E - 1296), & JP04219001 A 00000000 (FUJITSU) [Y] 1-5 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19850329), vol. 9, no. 69, Database accession no. (E - 305), & JP59207750 A 00000000 (NIPPON TECHNICAL KK) [A] 1 * abstract * |