EP0612712 - Process for the production of carboxylic acid anhydrides [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.02.1999 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 30.01.2008 [2008/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BP Chemicals Limited Britannic House, 1 Finsbury Circus London EC2M 7BA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1994/35] | For all designated states BP Chemicals Limited Britannic House 1 Finsbury Circus London EC2M 7BA / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sunley, John Glenn BP Chemicals Limited, Salt End Hull HU12 8DS / GB | 02 /
Watson, Derrick John BP Chemicals Limited, Salt End Hull HU12 8DS / GB | 03 /
Williams, Bruce Leo BP Chemicals Limited, Salt End Hull HU12 8DS / GB | 04 /
Watt, Robert John BP Chemicals Limited, Chertsey Road Sunbury-On-Thames, Middlesex TW16 7LN / GB | [1994/35] | Representative(s) | Perkins, Nicholas David, et al BP International Limited Patents and Agreements Division Chertsey Road Sunbury-on-Thames Middlesex TW16 7LN / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1994/35] | Perkins, Nicholas David, et al BP International Limited Patents and Agreements Division, Chertsey Road Sunbury-on-Thames, Middlesex TW16 7LN / GB | Application number, filing date | 94300872.2 | 07.02.1994 | [1994/35] | Priority number, date | GB19930003770 | 25.02.1993 Original published format: GB 9303770 | [1994/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0612712 | Date: | 31.08.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0612712 | Date: | 08.04.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.05.1994 | Classification | IPC: | C07C51/56, C07C53/12 | [1994/35] | CPC: |
C07C51/56 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL [1994/35] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von Carbonsäureanhydriden | [1994/35] | English: | Process for the production of carboxylic acid anhydrides | [1994/35] | French: | Procédé de préparation d'anhydrides d'acides carboxyliques | [1994/35] | Examination procedure | 23.12.1994 | Examination requested [1995/08] | 04.04.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.08.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.01.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 04.07.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 17.07.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.09.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 26.09.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.01.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.01.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.01.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.01.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 08.04.1998 | ES | 08.04.1998 | FR | 08.04.1998 | IT | 08.04.1998 | NL | 08.04.1998 | [2006/14] |
Former [2003/08] | BE | 08.04.1998 | |
ES | 08.04.1998 | ||
IT | 08.04.1998 | ||
NL | 08.04.1998 | ||
FR | 04.09.1998 | ||
Former [2002/26] | BE | 08.04.1998 | |
ES | 08.04.1998 | ||
IT | 08.04.1998 | ||
FR | 04.09.1998 | ||
Former [1999/42] | BE | 08.04.1998 | |
IT | 08.04.1998 | ||
FR | 04.09.1998 | ||
Former [1999/27] | BE | 08.04.1998 | |
FR | 04.09.1998 | ||
Former [1998/52] | FR | 04.09.1998 | Documents cited: | Search | [DY]EP0277824 (REILLY TAR & CHEM CORP [US]) [DY] 1-6,9 * page 3, line 44 - line 59 * * page 4, line 3 - line 10 * * claims 1-4,38-48 *; | [Y]US4874558 (FIFE WILMER K [US], et al) [Y] 1-6,9 * column 3, line 29 - line 34 * * claims 1,9 * |