EP0622526 - Rotor assembly [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1994/44] | Area ruled fan blade ends for turbofan jet engine | ||
[1997/38] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.07.1998 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.01.2003 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): NL | published on 19.02.2003 [2003/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TELEFLEX INCORPORATED 155 S. Limerick Road Limerick Pennsylvania 19468 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1994/44] | For all designated states TELEFLEX INCORPORATED 155 S. Limerick Road Limerick Pennsylvania 19468 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Roberts, William B. 1543 Vernal Avenue Fremont, California 94539 / US | [1994/44] | Representative(s) | Orr, William McLean, et al Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP Tower North Central Merrion Way Leeds LS2 8PA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1996/48] | Orr, William McLean, et al Urquhart-Dykes & Lord, Tower House, Merrion Way Leeds LS2 8PA / GB | ||
Former [1994/44] | Browne, Robin Forsythe, Dr. Urquhart-Dykes & Lord Tower House Merrion Way Leeds LS2 8PA West Yorkshire / GB | Application number, filing date | 94300924.1 | 08.02.1994 | [1994/44] | Priority number, date | US19930055203 | 30.04.1993 Original published format: US 55203 | [1994/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0622526 | Date: | 02.11.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0622526 | Date: | 17.09.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.08.1994 | Classification | IPC: | F01D5/14, F01D5/24, F02C7/04 | [1994/44] | CPC: |
F01D5/20 (EP,US);
F01D11/12 (EP,US);
F01D5/143 (EP,US);
F01D5/22 (EP,US);
F05D2220/327 (EP,US);
Y02T50/60 (EP,US);
Y10S415/914 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [1994/44] | Title | German: | Rotoreinheit | [1997/38] | English: | Rotor assembly | [1997/38] | French: | Ensemble de rotor | [1997/38] |
Former [1994/44] | Bläserschaufelende basierend auf regelbarem Querschnitt für ein Turbotriebwerk | ||
Former [1994/44] | Area ruled fan blade ends for turbofan jet engine | ||
Former [1994/44] | Extrémités d'aubes de turbosoufflante, à section réglée | Examination procedure | 18.04.1995 | Examination requested [1995/24] | 24.04.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.10.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.01.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 25.03.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.06.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 13.06.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.06.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.02.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.02.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 17.09.1997 | DE | 18.12.1997 | [2003/08] |
Former [1998/30] | DE | 18.12.1997 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB858706 (UNITED AIRCRAFT CORP) [A] 1-16,18 * page 1, line 55 - page 2, line 39; figure - *; | [A]US4012165 (KRAIG ALFRED HENRY) [A] 1-16,18 * column 2, line 25 - line 50; figure 1 *; | [A]FR996967 (RATEAU SOC) [A] 1; | [A]GB2192234 (ROLLS ROYCE PLC) [A] 1 * figures 6-7 *; | [A]EP0393283 (ROLLS ROYCE PLC [GB]) [A] 1 * column 4, line 21 - column 5, line 13; figures 2-3 *; | [A]US3989406 (BLISS DONALD B) [A] 1 * column 3, line 29 - line 32; figure 4 *; | [A]US4798519 (ZIPPS ROBERT H [US], et al) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]EP0266298 (UNITED TECHNOLOGIES CORP [US]) [A] 1 * paragraph [000.]; figure 1 *; | [A]US4566700 (SHIEMBOB LAWRENCE T [US]) [A] 17 * abstract *; | [T]US2874922 (WHITCOMB RICHARD T) [T] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]US3806067 (KUTNEY J) |