EP0611158 - Arc system cooler display rack [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.03.1999 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.08.2004 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 22.09.2004 [2004/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states L&P PROPERTY MANAGEMENT COMPANY 5950 West 51st Street Chicago Illinois 60638 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1994/33] | For all designated states L&P PROPERTY MANAGEMENT COMPANY 5950 West 51st Street Chicago, Illinois 60638 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bustos, Rafael T. 1305 St Lawrence Drive Alpharetta, Georgia 30202 / US | [1994/33] | Representative(s) | Findlay, Alice Rosemary, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1994/33] | Findlay, Alice Rosemary, et al Lloyd Wise, Tregear & Co. Norman House 105-109 Strand London WC2R 0AE / GB | Application number, filing date | 94300977.9 | 10.02.1994 | [1994/33] | Priority number, date | US19930016783 | 11.02.1993 Original published format: US 16783 | [1994/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0611158 | Date: | 17.08.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0611158 | Date: | 13.05.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.06.1994 | Classification | IPC: | A47F5/10, A47B57/04, A47F3/04, A47B91/00 | [1994/33] | CPC: |
A47B96/02 (EP,US);
A47B57/00 (EP,US);
A47B57/04 (EP,US);
A47B91/00 (EP,US);
A47F3/04 (EP,US);
A47F3/0486 (EP,US);
A47F5/103 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1994/33] | Title | German: | Gekühltes Arcsystempräsentationsgestell | [1994/33] | English: | Arc system cooler display rack | [1994/33] | French: | Casier de présentation réfrigéré de système arc | [1994/33] | Examination procedure | 13.02.1995 | Examination requested [1995/15] | 11.04.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.10.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.05.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 21.08.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.11.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 21.11.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.02.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.02.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.02.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.02.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | LU | 10.02.1999 | [2004/39] | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US3120199 (KOLSTER HARVEY L, et al) [X] 1,2,6 * column 1, line 70 - column 3, line 15; figures 1,2,4,5 * [Y] 4; | [A]US3794281 (MUNSEY R) [A] 5* abstract *; | [A]US4098480 (NEUMANN LEONARD H) [A] 1 * abstract * * column 4, line 20 - line 24 *; | [A]US4293062 (BUSTOS RAFAEL T) [A] 3 * figure 5 *; | [YA]US4344367 (MERL MILTON J) [Y] 4 * abstract * [A] 6,7 |