EP0613083 - Transaction management in object oriented systems [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.11.2002 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.04.2015 | Change - lapse in a contracting state | published on 20.05.2015 [2015/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SUN MICROSYSTEMS, INC. 2550 Garcia Avenue Mountain View, California 94043-1100 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1994/35] | For all designated states SUN MICROSYSTEMS, INC. 2550 Garcia Avenue Mountain View, California 94043-1100 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Khalidi, Yousef A. 633 W. Garland Terrace Sunnyvale, California 94086 / US | [1994/35] | Representative(s) | Wombwell, Francis Forresters 15, Hamilton Square Birkenhead Merseyside CH41 6BR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1994/35] | Wombwell, Francis Potts, Kerr & Co. 15, Hamilton Square Birkenhead Merseyside L41 6BR / GB | Application number, filing date | 94301025.6 | 11.02.1994 | [1994/35] | Priority number, date | US19930023027 | 25.02.1993 Original published format: US 23027 | [1994/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0613083 | Date: | 31.08.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/35] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0613083 | Date: | 01.02.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0613083 | Date: | 23.01.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.12.1994 | Classification | IPC: | G06F9/44, G06F9/46 | [1994/35] | CPC: |
G06F9/465 (EP,US);
G06F9/466 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, IT, NL, SE [1994/35] | Title | German: | Transaktionsverwaltung in objektorientiertem System | [1994/35] | English: | Transaction management in object oriented systems | [1994/35] | French: | Gestion de transactions dans un système orienté objet | [1994/35] | Examination procedure | 01.05.1995 | Examination requested [1995/26] | 21.04.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.10.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.03.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 27.07.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.10.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 22.10.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.10.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.02.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.01.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.01.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.01.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.01.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | |||
Former [2003/30] | DE | 24.04.2002 | Documents cited: | Search | [A] - "Transaction Processing System for the IBM PC.", IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN., NEW YORK US, (198807), vol. 31, no. 2, pages 114 - 115 [A] 1-42 * the whole document * | [A] - GUERRAOUI, "Dealing with Atomicity in Object-Based Distributed Systems.", OOPS MESSENGER, (199207), vol. 3, no. 3, doi:doi:10.1145/140959.140961, pages 10 - 13, XP058098863 [A] 1-42 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/140959.140961 |