EP0668340 - An improved process for removing heavy metals, sulfur and chlorinated compounds from used oil to generate clear fuel oils or lube stock and soft and/or hard asphalt with no acid sludge problem [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.03.2001 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.03.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.05.2001 [2001/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Santos, Benjamin Sy 353 Edsa Caloocan City / PH | [1995/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1995/34] | Representative(s) | Matthews, Derek Peter Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1995/34] | Matthews, Derek Peter Frank B. Dehn & Co. Imperial House 15-19 Kingsway London WC2B 6UZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 94301206.2 | 21.02.1994 | [1995/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0668340 | Date: | 23.08.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.08.1994 | Classification | IPC: | C10C3/02, C10C3/04, C10M175/00 | [1995/34] | CPC: |
C10M175/00 (EP);
C10C3/02 (EP);
C10C3/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1995/34] | Title | German: | Verbessertes Verfahren zur Entfernung von schweren Metallen, Schwefel und chlorierten Verbindungen aus Altölen und Regenerierung sauberer Brennstofföle oder Schmieröle und weicher und/oder festen Bitumen ohne Säureharzproblem | [1995/34] | English: | An improved process for removing heavy metals, sulfur and chlorinated compounds from used oil to generate clear fuel oils or lube stock and soft and/or hard asphalt with no acid sludge problem | [1995/34] | French: | Procédé amélioré pour l'élimination de métaux lourds, soufre et composés chlorés contenus dans une huile usagée afin de génerer des huiles combustibles ou des huiles lubrifiantes propres et du bitume mou et/ou dur sans problème de boues acides | [1995/34] | Examination procedure | 07.10.1995 | Examination requested [1995/49] | 17.03.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.09.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.02.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 04.11.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.09.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2001/19] | 26.09.2000 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2001/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.02.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.02.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.02.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 29.02.2000 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB2267097 (BENJAMIN SY SANTOS) [X] 1-8,27,28 * the whole document *; | [A]FR2259895 (INSTITUT FRANCAIS DU PETROLE) [A] 9-16,24-26,29-32 * page 4, line 10 - line 24 * * page 5; example 1 * * claims 1,4,10 *; | [A]US3565791 (K. URQUHARDT) [A] 9-11,14,34,35 * column 1, line 25 - line 30 * * column 3, line 35 - line 38 *; | [DA]US4029569 (H.D. IVEY) [DA] 9,10,24,25,34,35 * claims 1,2,4 *; | [A]GB448009 (F.G. BAENDER) [A] * page 2, line 48 - line 52; claim 1 * * page 2, line 101 - line 102 * * page 5, line 130 *; | [A]US4381992 (W.E. WOOD) [A] * column 4, line 59 - column 5, line 16 *; | [A]GB1594879 (LIONEL BORENSTEIN) |