EP0617354 - A portable computer with integral projector [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.03.2000 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.03.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.05.2000 [2000/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NCR International, Inc. 1700 South Patterson Boulevard Dayton Ohio 45479 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1996/23] | For all designated states NCR International, Inc. 1700 South Patterson Boulevard Dayton, Ohio 45479 / US | ||
Former [1994/39] | For all designated states AT&T GLOBAL INFORMATION SOLUTIONS INTERNATIONAL INC. 1700 South Patterson Boulevard Dayton, Ohio 45479 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Laughlin, David Paul 1020 Carlo Drive Kettering, Ohio 45429 / US | [1994/39] | Representative(s) | Cleary, Fidelma, et al NCR Limited International Patent Department 206 Marylebone Road London NW1 6LY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/05] | Cleary, Fidelma, et al International IP Department NCR Limited 206 Marylebone Road London NW1 6LY / GB | ||
Former [1996/24] | Robinson, Robert George, et al International Intellectual Property Department, NCR LIMITED, 915 High Road, North Finchley London N12 8QJ / GB | ||
Former [1994/39] | Robinson, Robert George International Patent Department NCR Limited 915 High Road North Finchley London N12 8QJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 94301414.2 | 28.02.1994 | [1994/39] | Priority number, date | US19930029492 | 11.03.1993 Original published format: US 29492 | [1994/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0617354 | Date: | 28.09.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0617354 | Date: | 12.05.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.08.1994 | Classification | IPC: | G06F1/16 | [1994/39] | CPC: |
G06F1/1639 (EP,US);
G06F1/1616 (EP,US);
G06F1/1647 (EP,US);
G06F1/1654 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1994/39] | Title | German: | Tragbarer Rechner mit integriertem Projektor | [1994/39] | English: | A portable computer with integral projector | [1994/39] | French: | Ordinateur portatif à projecteur incorporé | [1994/39] | Examination procedure | 10.03.1995 | Examination requested [1995/19] | 04.06.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 20.08.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.11.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 30.11.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.02.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.02.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.02.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.03.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.03.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0388976 (IN FOCUS SYSTEMS INC [US]) [X] 1,8 * page 9, line 47 - page 10, line 8 * * page 12, line 4 - line 17; figures 13-15,34 *; | [X]JPH04295880 ; | [A]US5041965 (CHEN CHIN-MAO [TW]) [A] 1-3,8 * column 1, line 7 - column 3, line 64; figures 2-7 * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19930304), vol. 17, no. 107, Database accession no. (P - 1496), & JP04295880 A 19921020 (HITACHI LTD.) [X] 1 * abstract * |