EP0615281 - Wafer release method and apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.08.2001 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.08.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 10.10.2001 [2001/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Axcelis Technologies, Inc. 55 Cherry Hill Drive Beverly, MA 01915-1053 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2000/33] | For all designated states Axcelis Technologies, Inc. 55 Cherry Hill Drive Beverly, MA 01915 / US | ||
Former [1994/37] | For all designated states EATON CORPORATION Eaton Center, 1111 Superior Avenue Cleveland, Ohio 44114-2584 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Blake, Julian G. 211 Hart Street Beverly Farms, Massachusetts 01915 / US | 02 /
Tu, Weilin 6 Oak Street Natick, Massachusetts 01760 / US | [1994/37] | Representative(s) | Burke, Steven David, et al R.G.C. Jenkins & Co 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1994/37] | Burke, Steven David, et al R.G.C. Jenkins & Co. 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 94301606.3 | 08.03.1994 | [1994/37] | Priority number, date | US19930029154 | 10.03.1993 Original published format: US 29154 | [1994/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0615281 | Date: | 14.09.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0615281 | Date: | 25.10.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.06.1994 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/00 | [1994/37] | CPC: |
H01L21/67259 (EP,US);
H01L21/68 (KR);
H01L21/6831 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1994/37] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Einrichtung zur Freigabe einer Halbleiterplatte | [1994/37] | English: | Wafer release method and apparatus | [1994/37] | French: | Méthode et dispositif pour libérer une galette semi-conductrice | [1994/37] | Examination procedure | 09.03.1995 | Examination requested [1995/19] | 10.04.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.07.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.08.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.01.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.11.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.04.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.07.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 21.12.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 29.12.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.03.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 23.03.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.07.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.03.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.03.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.03.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 04.03.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 06.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0460955 (VARIAN ASSOCIATES [US]) [X] 1-5 * the whole document *; | [X]FR2676603 (UNISEARCH LTD [AU]) [X] 1-8 * the whole document *; | [DA]US5103367 (HORWITZ CHRISTOPHER M [AU], et al); | [PX]EP0552877 (APPLIED MATERIALS INC [US]) [PX] 1-8 * the whole document * |