blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0615144

EP0615144 - Colored plastic lens and method of manufacture therefor [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  15.12.2000
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip15.12.2000No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 31.01.2001 [2001/05]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
NIKON CORPORATION
Fuji Building
2-3 Marunouchi 3-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-0005 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2000/07]For all designated states
NIKON CORPORATION
Fuji Building, 2-3 Marunouchi 3-chome, Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-0005 / JP
Former [1994/37]For all designated states
NIKON CORPORATION
Fuji Building, 2-3 marunouchi 3-chome, Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Ono, Ichiro
7-6, Nishikamata 4-chome
Ota-ku, Tokyo / JP
02 / Kawamura, Yuko
9-23-310, Shukugo 2-chome
Utsunomiya-shi, Tochigi-ken / JP
[1994/37]
Representative(s)West, Alan Harry, et al
R.G.C. Jenkins & Co 26 Caxton Street
London SW1H 0RJ / GB
[N/P]
Former [1994/37]West, Alan Harry, et al
R.G.C. Jenkins & Co. 26 Caxton Street
London SW1H 0RJ / GB
Application number, filing date94301767.311.03.1994
[1994/37]
Priority number, dateJP1993005105511.03.1993         Original published format: JP 5105593
[1994/37]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0615144
Date:14.09.1994
Language:EN
[1994/37]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0615144
Date:08.03.1995
Language:EN
[1995/10]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0615144
Date:16.02.2000
Language:EN
[2000/07]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.01.1995
ClassificationIPC:G02B5/22, G02B1/10, G02C7/10
[1994/37]
CPC:
G02B1/105 (EP); G02B1/14 (EP,US); G02B1/111 (EP,US);
G02C7/021 (EP,US); G02C7/108 (EP,US); Y10T428/25 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31507 (EP,US); Y10T428/31511 (EP,US); Y10T428/31551 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31598 (EP,US); Y10T428/31663 (EP,US) (-)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [1994/37]
TitleGerman:Farbige Kunststofflinse und Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung[1994/37]
English:Colored plastic lens and method of manufacture therefor[1994/37]
French:Lentille en matière plastique colorée et méthode de fabrication[1994/37]
Examination procedure22.08.1995Examination requested  [1995/42]
06.11.1997Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
16.03.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.03.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
21.07.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
20.10.1999Fee for grant paid
20.10.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)17.11.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2001/05]
Fees paidRenewal fee
08.03.1996Renewal fee patent year 03
12.03.1997Renewal fee patent year 04
09.09.1998Renewal fee patent year 05
29.03.1999Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.03.199805   M06   Fee paid on   09.09.1998
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[Y]JPS6045201  ;
 [Y]JPS60221704  ;
 [A]US4320940  (MUELLER GARY E, et al) [A] 1-20* column 2, line 54 - column 9, line 42; figures 1-12 *;
 [A]EP0125866  (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US]) [A] 1-20 * page 2, line 21 - page 6, line 2 *;
 [A]FR2549968  (SUWA SEIKOSHA KK [JP]) [A] 1-5,10,11,15-20 * p. 11, l. 13 - p. 14, l. 25; p. 18, l. 25 - p. 19, l. 10; fig. 1 *;
 [A]US4547397  (BURZYNSKI ALFRED J [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * column 1, line 56 - column 3, line 45 *
 [Y]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19850712), vol. 9, no. 167, Database accession no. (P - 372)<1890>, & JP60045201 A 19850311 (SUWA SEIKOSHA K.K.) [Y] 1-5,10,11,15-20 * abstract *
 [Y]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19860403), vol. 10, no. 84, Database accession no. (P - 442)<2141>, & JP60221704 A 19851106 (HOOYA K.K.) [Y] 1-5,10,11,15-20 * abstract *
ExaminationUS4963159
 US5015523
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.