EP0615855 - Recording sheets containing pyridinium and/or piperazinum compounds [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.03.1998 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.03.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 06.05.1998 [1998/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Xerox Corporation Xerox Square Rochester New York 14644 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1994/38] | For all designated states XEROX CORPORATION Xerox Square Rochester New York 14644 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Malhotra, Shadi L. 4191 Taffey Crescent Mississauga, Ontario L5L 2A6 / CA | 02 /
Bryant, Brent S. 8594 First Line, RR No. 3 Milton, Ontario L9T 2X7 / CA | [1994/38] | Representative(s) | Pike, Christopher Gerard, et al Rank Xerox Ltd., Patent Department, Parkway Marlow Buckinghamshire SL7 1YL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1996/42] | Pike, Christopher Gerard, et al Rank Xerox Ltd., Patent Department, Parkway Marlow, Buckinghamshire SL7 1YL / GB | ||
Former [1994/38] | Hill, Cecilia Ann, et al Rank Xerox Ltd Patent Department Parkway Marlow Buckinghamshire SL7 1YL / GB | Application number, filing date | 94301964.6 | 18.03.1994 | [1994/38] | Priority number, date | US19930033917 | 19.03.1993 Original published format: US 33917 | [1994/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0615855 | Date: | 21.09.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0615855 | Date: | 14.05.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.07.1994 | Classification | IPC: | B41M5/00 | [1994/38] | CPC: |
B41M5/5227 (EP,US);
Y10S428/913 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24901 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31504 (EP,US);
Y10T428/3154 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31786 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31797 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1994/38] | Title | German: | Pyridinium- und/oder Piperaziniumverbindungen enthaltende Aufzeichnungsschichten | [1994/38] | English: | Recording sheets containing pyridinium and/or piperazinum compounds | [1994/38] | French: | Feuilles d'enregistrement contenant des composés pyridinium et/ou piperazinium | [1994/38] | Examination procedure | 21.03.1995 | Examination requested [1995/20] | 07.03.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.08.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.11.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 13.01.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.02.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 24.02.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.02.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.04.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.04.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS6230169 ; | [A]EP0199874 (MEAD CORP [US]) [A] 1,9,10 * page 7, line 8 - page 8, line 25 *; | [X]WO9301938 (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US]) [X] 1-5,7-11 * page 5, line 1 - line 23 * * claim 1 * * page 8, line 3 - line 14 * * page 19, Ex. No. 34 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19870703), vol. 11, no. 206, Database accession no. (C - 433), & JP62030169 A 19870209 (MITSUBISHI CHEM IND LTD) [A] 1,3 * abstract * |