EP0617129 - Process and apparatus for the production of bioproteins [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.08.1999 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.08.1999 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.09.1999 [1999/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE BOC GROUP, INC. 575 Mountain Avenue Murray Hill, New Jersey 07974 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1995/44] | For all designated states THE BOC GROUP, INC. 575 Mountain Avenue Murray Hill, New Jersey 07974 / US | ||
Former [1994/39] | For all designated states THE BOC GROUP, INC. 575 Mountain Avenue Murray Hill, New Providence, New Jersey 07974 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ramachandran, Ramakrishnan 232 Hillside Avenue Allendale, New Jersey 07401 / US | 02 /
Shirley, Arthur I. 373 New Market Road Piscataway, New Jersey 08854 / US | [1994/39] | Representative(s) | Wickham, Michael, et al C/o Patent and Trademark Department The BOC Group plc Chertsey Road Windlesham Surrey GU20 6HJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1994/39] | Wickham, Michael, et al c/o Patent and Trademark Department The BOC Group plc Chertsey Road Windlesham Surrey GU20 6HJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 94302091.7 | 23.03.1994 | [1994/39] | Priority number, date | US19930037943 | 26.03.1993 Original published format: US 37943 | [1994/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0617129 | Date: | 28.09.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/39] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0617129 | Date: | 15.03.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.01.1995 | Classification | IPC: | C12P21/00, C12N1/26 | [1994/39] | CPC: |
C12P21/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, DK, FR, GB, IE, IT, NL, SE [1994/39] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Herstellung von Bioproteinen | [1994/39] | English: | Process and apparatus for the production of bioproteins | [1994/39] | French: | Procédé et appareil pour la production de bioprotéines | [1994/39] | Examination procedure | 17.08.1995 | Examination requested [1995/41] | 24.09.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.04.1999 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1999/39] | 04.05.1999 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1999/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.02.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.02.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.02.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 04.03.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DD105627 (GRIGORIAN ET AL.) [Y] 1; | [Y]US3816250 (OVERBECK J, et al) [Y] 1; | [YD]US3833477 (BRUGEROLLE J, et al) [YD] 1; | [A]DD157866 (ADW DDR [DD])[A] 1; | [X]DD157971 (GLOMBITZA FRANZ, et al) [X] 1,2,11; | [YD]US4690696 (SIRCAR SHIVAJI [US], et al) [YD] 1 |