EP0618244 - Multiple curable composition and use thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.05.1999 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.09.2003 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): DK | published on 05.11.2003 [2003/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MacDermid, Incorporated 245 Freight Street Waterbury, CT 06702 / US | [1999/04] |
Former [1997/51] | For all designated states NATIONAL STARCH AND CHEMICAL INVESTMENT HOLDING CORPORATION 3411 Silverside Road Wilmington, Delaware 19850 / US | ||
Former [1994/40] | For all designated states W.R. GRACE & CO.-CONN. 1114 Avenue of the Americas New York New York 10036-7794 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kyle, David Ray 9421 Granite Hill Road Columbia, Maryland 21046 / US | [1994/40] | Representative(s) | Jones, Helen M.M., et al Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/51] | Jones, Helen Marjorie Meredith, et al Gill Jennings & Every, Broadgate House, 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | ||
Former [1995/19] | Jones, Helen Marjorie Meredith Gill Jennings & Every, Broadgate House, 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | ||
Former [1994/40] | Peet, Jillian Wendy Gill Jennings & Every Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 94302274.9 | 29.03.1994 | [1994/40] | Priority number, date | US19930038772 | 29.03.1993 Original published format: US 38772 | [1994/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0618244 | Date: | 05.10.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/40] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0618244 | Date: | 25.01.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0618244 | Date: | 15.07.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.12.1994 | Classification | IPC: | C08G18/79, C08G18/82, C09D175/14, C08F299/06 | [1994/40] | CPC: |
C08G18/728 (EP);
C08F290/067 (EP);
C08G18/302 (EP);
C09D4/00 (EP);
H05K3/287 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C09D4/00, C08F222/1006 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, NL, PT, SE [1994/40] | Title | German: | Härtbare Mehrfachzusammensetzung und Verwendung | [1994/40] | English: | Multiple curable composition and use thereof | [1994/40] | French: | Composition multiple durcissable et son utilisation | [1994/40] | Examination procedure | 24.07.1995 | Examination requested [1995/38] | 23.12.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.04.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.09.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 22.12.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 16.01.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.04.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 20.04.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.04.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.03.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.03.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.03.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 15.07.1998 | CH | 15.07.1998 | GR | 15.07.1998 | LI | 15.07.1998 | DK | 15.10.1998 | PT | 15.10.1998 | IE | 29.03.1999 | [2003/45] |
Former [2001/23] | AT | 15.07.1998 | |
CH | 15.07.1998 | ||
GR | 15.07.1998 | ||
LI | 15.07.1998 | ||
PT | 15.10.1998 | ||
IE | 29.03.1999 | ||
Former [2000/27] | AT | 15.07.1998 | |
CH | 15.07.1998 | ||
LI | 15.07.1998 | ||
PT | 15.10.1998 | ||
IE | 29.03.1999 | ||
Former [2000/17] | AT | 15.07.1998 | |
CH | 15.07.1998 | ||
LI | 15.07.1998 | ||
PT | 15.10.1998 | ||
Former [1999/29] | AT | 15.07.1998 | |
PT | 15.10.1998 | ||
Former [1999/22] | AT | 15.07.1998 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4391686 (MILLER HENRY C, et al) [X] 1 * column 3, line 25 - column 14, line 65; example -; claims 1-10 *; | [DA]US4415604 (NATIVI LARRY A [US]); | [X]EP0100688 (MITSUI PETROCHEMICAL IND [JP]) [X] 1-6 * page 6, line 30 - page 12, line 12; claims 1-4 *; | [X]EP0149867 (PHILIPS CORP [US]) [X] 1 * page 1, line 31 - page 3, line 6; example -; claim 1 *; | [A]EP0347610 (BAYER AG [DE]) [A] 1 * claims 1-5 *; | [PX]EP0553007 (COOK COMPOSITES & POLYMERS [US]) [PX] 1 * page 2, line 30 - page 4, line 21; example 11 *; | [PX]WO9320137 (ICI PLC [GB], et al) [PX] 1 * example 1; claims 1-4 *; | [E]EP0603046 (CECA SA [FR]) [E] 1 * page 3, line 30 - page 5, line 6; claims 1-9 * |