Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP0618236
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
27.08.1999 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 13.10.1999 [1999/41] |
04.09.1998 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 21.10.1998 [1998/43] |
17.07.1998 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
02.04.1998 |
Renewal fee |
|
25.03.1998 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
25.03.1998 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
20.11.1997 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
01.10.1997 |
Examination report or reply |
|
16.05.1997 |
First examination report |
|
14.05.1997 |
Examination report or reply |
|
02.04.1997 |
Renewal fee |
|
02.04.1996 |
Renewal fee |
|
08.01.1996 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 14.02.1996 [1996/07] |
12.05.1995 |
Publication of search report |
published on 05.07.1995 [1995/27] |
19.08.1994 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 05.10.1994 [1994/40] |