Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP3507528B | Global Dossier | 15.03.2004 | B2 | JPH06336501 | 06.12.1994 | A | Priority number | Date | JP22377693 | 17.08.1993 | JP9688793 | 31.03.1993 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0618236 | Global Dossier | 21.10.1998 | B1 | EP0618236 | 05.07.1995 | A3 | EP0618236 | 05.10.1994 | A2 | Priority number | Date | JP22377693 | 17.08.1993 | JP9688793 | 31.03.1993 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN1102933C | 12.03.2003 | C | CN1093373 | 12.10.1994 | A | Priority number | Date | JP22377693 | 17.08.1993 | JP9688793 | 31.03.1993 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69414020T | 18.03.1999 | T2 | DE69414020D1 | 26.11.1998 | D1 | Priority number | Date | JP22377693 | 17.08.1993 | JP9688793 | 31.03.1993 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR100319784B | 04.07.2002 | B1 | KR940021584 | 19.10.1994 | A | Priority number | Date | JP22377693 | 17.08.1993 | JP9688793 | 31.03.1993 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | TW251291B | 11.07.1995 | B | Priority number | Date | JP22377693 | 17.08.1993 | JP9688793 | 31.03.1993 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5449771 | 12.09.1995 | A | Priority number | Date | JP22377693 | 17.08.1993 | JP9688793 | 31.03.1993 |