blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0619672

EP0619672 - Apparatus and technique for generating a screen reproduction of an image [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  10.11.2000
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip10.11.2000No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 27.12.2000 [2000/52]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SCITEX CORPORATION LTD.
7 Hamada Street
Herzliya 46103 / IL
[1994/41]
Inventor(s)01 / Weiss, Alex
14/18 Neot Golda Mayer
Netanya 42345 / IL
02 / Gronemann, Uri F.
3 Recanati Street
Tel Aviv 69496 / IL
[1994/41]
Representative(s)Hillier, Peter, et al
Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London
WC2E 9RA / GB
[N/P]
Former [1994/41]Hillier, Peter, et al
Reginald W. Barker & Co., Chancery House, 53-64, Chancery Lane
London, WC2A 1QU / GB
Application number, filing date94302396.005.04.1994
[1994/41]
Priority number, dateIL1993010534308.04.1993         Original published format: IL 10534393
[1994/41]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0619672
Date:12.10.1994
Language:EN
[1994/41]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0619672
Date:11.01.1995
Language:EN
[1995/02]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0619672
Date:12.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/02]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP24.11.1994
ClassificationIPC:H04N1/40
[1994/41]
CPC:
H04N1/4058 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [1994/41]
TitleGerman:Gerät und Verfahren zur Erzeugung einer gerasterten Bildreproduktion[1994/41]
English:Apparatus and technique for generating a screen reproduction of an image[1994/41]
French:Appareil et technique pour la génération d'une reproduction d'image à trame[1994/41]
Examination procedure30.05.1995Examination requested  [1995/30]
13.03.1997Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
08.06.1997Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.09.1997Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
13.03.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.05.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
28.09.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.05.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
07.07.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
14.07.1999Fee for grant paid
14.07.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)13.10.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2000/52]
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.03.1996Renewal fee patent year 03
18.03.1997Renewal fee patent year 04
16.03.1998Renewal fee patent year 05
23.03.1999Renewal fee patent year 06
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]US4040094  (EVERETT ROBERT CHARLES, et al);
 [A]US4185304  (HOLLADAY THOMAS M [US]);
 [Y]GB2098022  (DAINIPPON SCREEN MFG) [Y] 3-5 * page 3, line 82 - page 5, line 110 * * page 7, line 127 - page 8, line 35 *;
 [A]EP0292732  (DAINIPPON SCREEN MFG [JP]) [A] 7,10 * column 4, line 38 - column 5, line 57 *;
 [XY]US4806946  (OHNISHI MASAHIRO [JP]) [X] 1,2,6-10 * the whole document * [Y] 3-5;
 [DA]US4825298  (IKUTA KUNIO [JP], et al);
 [A]WO9116784  (ZED INSTR LTD [GB]);
 [A]WO9116783  (LINOTYPE AG [DE])
ExaminationUS4985779
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.