EP0622720 - Ejection assembly for a computer [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 07.03.1997 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.03.1997 | Withdrawal of application | published on 23.04.1997 [1997/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation New Orchard Road Armonk, NY 10504 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1994/44] | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation Old Orchard Road Armonk, N.Y. 10504 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ishihara, Yoshihisa Dia Palace 905, 2570-1, Shimotsuruma Yamato-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | 02 /
Sasakawa, Tetsuroh 5912-18, Okazaki Hiratsuka-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | 03 /
Fujino, Takane Amenityhill Honatsugi 513, 1620-1, Iiyama Atsugi-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | [1994/44] | Representative(s) | Lloyd, Richard Graham IBM (UK) Ltd. UK Intellectual Property Department Hursley Park Winchester Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1994/44] | Lloyd, Richard Graham IBM (UK) Ltd, UK Intellectual Property Department, Hursley Park Winchester, Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB | Application number, filing date | 94302474.5 | 07.04.1994 | [1994/44] | Priority number, date | JP19930100616 | 27.04.1993 Original published format: JP 10061693 | [1994/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0622720 | Date: | 02.11.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.08.1994 | Classification | IPC: | G06F1/16, G06F1/18, H01R13/633 | [1994/44] | CPC: |
G06F1/1616 (EP,US);
G06F1/1632 (EP,US);
G06F1/1656 (EP,US);
H01R13/633 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1994/44] | Title | German: | Auswurfanordnung für Computer | [1994/44] | English: | Ejection assembly for a computer | [1994/44] | French: | Dispositif d'éjection pour ordinateur | [1994/44] | Examination procedure | 27.02.1995 | Examination requested [1995/17] | 01.03.1997 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1997/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.04.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0438914 (SHARP KK [JP]) [X] 1,2,5,7,8 * the whole document *; | [Y]EP0385750 (DU PONT [US]) [Y] 1,2,5 * the whole document *; | [Y]US5201665 (MCCARDELL JR WILLARD B [US], et al) [Y] 1,2,5 * column A; figure - *; | [A]WO9100681 (POQET COMPUTER CORP [US]) [A] 1,3,5,8 * page 8, line 28 - line 32; figures 3,6A-7 *; | [A]US5197894 (KOIKE KAZUMASA [JP]) [A] 1,2,6 * column A; figure - *; | [A]US3869586 (PATZ ROMAN J, et al) [A] 4 * column A; figure - *; | [A]GB2257461 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [A] 4 * page 8, line 3 - line 6; figure - *; | [A]EP0501502 (YAZAKI CORP [JP]) [A] 1,2 * abstract * |