EP0624002 - Housings for transmitter/receiver units [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.03.1997 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.03.1997 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.05.1997 [1997/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PLESSEY SEMICONDUCTORS LIMITED Cheney Manor Swindon Wiltshire SN2 2QW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1994/45] | For all designated states PLESSEY SEMICONDUCTORS LIMITED Cheney Manor Swindon, Wiltshire SN2 2QW / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Forshaw, John Andrew Eastgate House, 8 Eastgate Bassingham, Lincoln LN5 9JS / GB | [1994/45] | Representative(s) | Hoste, Colin Francis Marconi Intellectual Property Crompton Close Basildon Essex SS14 3BA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1994/45] | Hoste, Colin Francis The General Electric Company p.l.c. GEC Patent Department Waterhouse Lane Chelmsford, Essex CM1 2QX / GB | Application number, filing date | 94302566.8 | 12.04.1994 | [1994/45] | Priority number, date | GB19930009303 | 06.05.1993 Original published format: GB 9309303 | [1994/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0624002 | Date: | 09.11.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/45] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0624002 | Date: | 28.02.1996 | [1996/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.01.1996 | Classification | IPC: | H04B1/38, H05K5/02, H01Q1/22 | [1996/09] | CPC: |
G06F1/1656 (US);
G06F1/1698 (US);
H04B1/38 (EP);
H04B1/3816 (EP,US);
H05K5/0265 (US)
|
Former IPC [1994/45] | H04B1/38 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, IT, NL, SE [1994/45] | Title | German: | Gehäusen für Sendeempfänger | [1994/45] | English: | Housings for transmitter/receiver units | [1994/45] | French: | Boîtiers pour émetteurs-récepteurs | [1994/45] | File destroyed: | 13.09.2003 | Examination procedure | 01.05.1996 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1997/20] | 02.12.1996 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1997/20] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 07.10.1996 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.1996 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0526688 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT) [A] 1-3 * column 1, line 35 - column 2, line 39; figure - *; | [A]EP0434231 (HEWLETT PACKARD CO) [A] 1,2 * abstract *; | [A]US5061845 (PINNAVAIA GIUSEPPE) [A] 1,2 * abstract *; | [A]JPS63288549 ; | [E]EP0610025 (AT & T CORP) [E] 1,2 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19890322), vol. 013, no. 117, Database accession no. (E - 731), & JP63288549 A 19881125 (NEC CORP) [A] 1-4 * abstract * |