EP0620269 - Cleaning composition [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.12.1997 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.12.1997 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.02.1998 [1998/07] | Applicant(s) | For:GB
IE
Unilever PLC Unilever House Blackfriars London Greater London EC4P 4BQ / GB | For:AT
BE
CH
DE
DK
ES
FR
GR
IT
LI
NL
PT
SE
Unilever N.V. Weena 455 3013 AL Rotterdam / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1995/32] | For:GB
IE
UNILEVER PLC Unilever House Blackfriars London EC4P 4BQ / GB | ||
For:AT
BE
CH
DE
DK
ES
FR
GR
IT
LI
NL
PT
SE
UNILEVER N.V. Weena 455 NL-3013 AL Rotterdam / NL | |||
Former [1994/42] | For:GB
IE
UNILEVER PLC Unilever House Blackfriars London EC4P 4BQ / GB | ||
For:AT
BE
CH
DE
DK
ES
FR
GR
IT
LI
NL
PT
SE
UNILEVER N.V. Weena 455 NL-3013 AL Rotterdam / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Orlandini, Francesco Maurizio Research Laboratory, Olivier van Noortlaan 120 NL-3133 AT Vlaardingen / NL | [1994/42] | Representative(s) | Elliott, Peter William, et al Unilever Patent Group Colworth House Sharnbrook Bedford MK44 1LQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1994/42] | Elliott, Peter William, et al Unilever plc Patent Division Colworth House Sharnbrook Bedford MK44 1LQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 94302615.3 | 13.04.1994 | [1994/42] | Priority number, date | GB19930007805 | 15.04.1993 Original published format: GB 9307805 | [1994/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0620269 | Date: | 19.10.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.08.1994 | Classification | IPC: | C11D1/37, C11D1/06 | [1994/42] | CPC: |
C11D1/06 (EP);
C11D1/94 (EP);
C11D1/29 (EP);
C11D1/90 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, NL, PT, SE [1994/42] | Title | German: | Reinigungsmittel | [1994/42] | English: | Cleaning composition | [1994/42] | French: | Composition de nettoyage | [1994/42] | Examination procedure | 25.11.1994 | Examination requested [1995/04] | 07.04.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.08.1997 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1998/07] | 17.09.1997 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1998/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.04.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.1997 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0215504 (STAMICARBON B.V.) [X] 1,5,6; | [XD]EP0102118 (CHEM-Y FABRIK VAN CHEMISCHE PRODUKTEN B.V.) [XD] 1,5,6 |