EP0622891 - Low loss synchronous rectifier for application to clamped-mode power converters [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.06.2007 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.06.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.07.2007 [2007/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AT&T Corp. 32 Avenue of the Americas New York, NY 10013-2412 / US | [1994/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rozman, Allen Frank 1702 Waverly Court Richardson, Texas 75082 / US | [1994/44] | Representative(s) | Warren, Keith Stanley, et al Baron Warren Redfern Cambridge House 100 Cambridge Grove Hammersmith, London W6 0LE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/21] | Warren, Keith Stanley, et al BARON & WARREN 18 South End Kensington London W8 5BU / GB | ||
Former [1994/44] | Buckley, Christopher Simon Thirsk, et al AT&T (UK) LTD., AT&T Intellectual Property Division, 5 Mornington Road Woodford Green, Essex IG8 0TU / GB | Application number, filing date | 94302791.2 | 20.04.1994 | [1994/44] | Priority number, date | US19930054918 | 29.04.1993 Original published format: US 54918 | [1994/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0622891 | Date: | 02.11.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/44] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0622891 | Date: | 11.01.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0622891 | Date: | 26.07.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.11.1994 | Classification | IPC: | H02M7/217, H02M3/335 | [1994/44] | CPC: |
H02M7/217 (EP,US);
H02M3/33569 (EP,US);
H02M3/33592 (EP,US);
Y02B70/10 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1994/44] | Title | German: | Verlustarmer Synchrongleichrichter zur Verwendung bei spannungsbegrenzten Leistungswandlern | [1994/44] | English: | Low loss synchronous rectifier for application to clamped-mode power converters | [1994/44] | French: | Redresseur synchrone à faibles pertes pour application à convertisseurs de puissance à tension limitée | [1994/44] | Examination procedure | 30.06.1995 | Examination requested [1995/35] | 07.03.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.07.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.08.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.12.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.03.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.07.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.07.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.01.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.06.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.01.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.07.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 19.04.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 29.06.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.09.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.12.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.02.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.06.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 02.06.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP00108230.4 / EP1052763 | Opposition(s) | 27.04.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/27] | Request for further processing for: | 29.06.2005 | Request for further processing filed | 29.06.2005 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 14.07.2005 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.04.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.04.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.04.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.04.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 08.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 07.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 06.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 05.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 26.04.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2001 | 08   M06   Fee paid on   10.05.2001 | 30.04.2005 | 12   M06   Fee paid on   05.07.2005 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0428377 (COMPUTER PRODUCTS INC [US]) [A] 3 * figure 5; claim 6 *; | [A]EP0474471 (ITT [US]) [A] 2* column 6, line 41 - line 46; figure 1 *; | [A] - J. BLANC, "Practical application of MOSFET Synchronous Rectifiers", INTELEC 91, KYOTO, JAPAN, (19911105), pages 495 - 501, XP000314624 [A] 1-3 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/INTLEC.1991.172441 |