EP0621339 - Immunogenic human influenza A virus haemagglutinin polypeptides [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.08.2002 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 30.01.2008 [2008/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TAKARA SHUZO CO. LTD. 609 Takenaka-cho Fushimi-ku, Kyoto-shi Kyoto-fu / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1994/43] | For all designated states TAKARA SHUZO CO. LTD. 609 Takenaka-cho Fushimi-ku, Kyoto-shi, Kyoto-fu / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Okuno, Yoshinobu 1-24-E-808, Kamishinden Toyonaka-shi, Osaka-fu / JP | 02 /
Isegawa, Yuiji 7-43, Ichiban-cho, Hiyoshidai Takatsuki-shi, Osaka-fu / JP | 03 /
Sasao, Fuyoko 2-6-G-201 Tenno Ibaraki-shi, Osaka-fu / JP | 04 /
Ueda, Shigeharu 1-36, Kitarokkodai Nishinomiya-shi, Hyogo-ken / JP | [1994/43] | Representative(s) | Wakerley, Helen Rachael Reddie & Grose LLP The White Chapel Building 10 Whitechapel High Street London E1 8QS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1994/43] | Wakerley, Helen Rachael Reddie & Grose, 16 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 94302819.1 | 20.04.1994 | [1994/43] | Priority number, date | JP19930115216 | 20.04.1993 Original published format: JP 11521693 | JP19940070194 | 16.03.1994 Original published format: JP 7019494 | [1994/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0621339 | Date: | 26.10.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/43] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0621339 | Date: | 29.11.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0621339 | Date: | 24.10.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.10.1995 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/44, A61K39/145, C07K14/11, C07K16/10 | [2000/46] | CPC: |
C07K14/005 (EP);
C07K16/1018 (EP);
A61K38/00 (EP);
A61K39/00 (EP);
C12N2760/16122 (EP);
C12N2760/16134 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1995/48] | C12N15/44, A61K39/145, C07K15/00 | ||
Former IPC [1994/43] | C12N15/44, A61K39/145, C07K13/00 | Designated contracting states | CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, SE [1994/43] | Title | German: | Immunogene Polypeptide des menschlichen Influenza-A-Virus Haemagglutinin | [1994/43] | English: | Immunogenic human influenza A virus haemagglutinin polypeptides | [1994/43] | French: | Polypeptides immunogès dérivées du haemagglutinen de virus de la influenza type A humain | [1994/43] | Biological material | This application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details | Examination procedure | 28.02.1996 | Examination requested [1996/19] | 02.11.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.04.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.12.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 16.03.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 11.04.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.07.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 05.07.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.07.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.04.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.04.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.04.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.04.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CH | 24.10.2001 | IT | 24.10.2001 | LI | 24.10.2001 | SE | 24.01.2002 | ES | 30.04.2002 | [2008/05] |
Former [2004/04] | CH | 24.10.2001 | |
LI | 24.10.2001 | ||
SE | 24.01.2002 | ||
ES | 30.04.2002 | ||
Former [2003/01] | CH | 24.10.2001 | |
LI | 24.10.2001 | ||
SE | 24.01.2002 | ||
Former [2002/26] | SE | 24.01.2002 | Documents cited: | Search | [XD]WO8400687 (SCRIPPS CLINIC RES [US]) [XD] 1,3,6,9 * page 6, line 31 - page 7, line 7 *; | [XD]DD228737 (INST F ANGEWANDTE VIROLOGIE [DD]) [XD] 1,6,11-13 * the whole document *; | [E]WO9417826 (SMITHKLINE BEECHAM CORP [US], et al) [E] 1,4,6,9,14,16* page 8, line 18 - line 33 * | [X] - M.J.GETHING ET AL, "Cloning and DNA sequence of double-stranded copies of hemagglutinin genes from H2 and H3 strains", NATURE, vol. 287, pages 301 - 306 [X] 14-17 * figure 5 * | [X] - M. VERHOEYEN ET AL., "Antigenic drift between the haemagglutinin of the Hong Kong influneza strains A/Aichi/2/68 and A/Victoria/3/75", NATURE, vol. 286, pages 771 - 776 [X] 14-17 * figure 1 * | [X] - R. FFRENCH ET AL., "Class-II restricted T cell clones to a synthetic peptide of influenza virus haemagglutinin", J. VIROL., vol. 63, no. 7, pages 3087 - 3094 [X] 1,3,6,9 * the whole document * | [A] - H. BECHT ET AL., "Immunogenic properties of the small chain HA2 of the haemagglutinin of influenza viruses", J. GEN. VIROL., vol. 65, pages 173 - 183 [A] 1 * the whole document * | [X] - R. RUIGROK ET AL., "Studies on the structure of influenza virus haemagglutinin at the pH of membrane fusion", J. GEN. VIROL., vol. 69, pages 2785 - 2795 [X] 1,4,6,9,11-14 * figure 8 * | [X] - M. HOLLOSI ET AL., "Conformational and functional prpperties of peptides coverintg the intersubunit region of influenza virus haemagglutinin", EUR. J. BIOCHEM., vol. 206, no. 2, pages 421 - 425 [X] 1,2,6,7 * page 422, line 1 - line 7 * | [T] - Z. NAGY ET AL., "The intersubunit region of the Influenza virus haemagglutinin is recognised by antibodies during infection", SCAND. J. IMMUNOL., vol. 40, no. 3, pages 281 - 291 [T] 1,2,6,7 * page 287, column 2, line 42 - page 288, column 2, line 3; figures 4,8 * |