EP0623839 - A projection type television receiver and its application in a large screen video display apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.11.1998 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.11.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 13.01.1999 [1999/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1998/04] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka-fu, 571 / JP | ||
Former [1994/50] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Ohaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka-fu, 571 / JP | ||
Former [1994/45] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD 1006-banchi, Oaza-Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yamada, Tadayoshi 5-17-4, Kibougaoka, Toyono-cho Toyono-gun, Osaka 563-02 / JP | 02 /
Tozuka, Masahiro 10-1-414, Bessohon-machi Takatsuki-shi, Osaka 569 / JP | 03 /
Goto, Katumi 6-5, Shibatani-cho Takatsuki-shi, Osaka 569 / JP | 04 /
Simatani, Tuyoshi 18-68, Hazukashifurukawa, Fushimi-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 612 / JP | 05 /
Maeda, Yoshinobu 3-15-17, Myokenzaka Katano-shi, Osaka 576 / JP | [1998/04] |
Former [1994/45] | 01 /
Yamada, Tadayoshi 5-17-4, Kobougaoka, Toyono-cho Toyono-gun, Osaka 563-02 / JP | ||
02 /
Tozuka, Masahiro 10-1-414, Bessohon-machi Takatsuki-shi, Osaka 569 / JP | |||
03 /
Goto, Katumi 6-5, Shibatani-cho Takatsuki-shi, Osaka 569 / JP | |||
04 /
Simatani, Tuyoshi 18-68, Hazukashifurukawa, Fushimi-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 612 / JP | |||
05 /
Maeda, Yoshinobu 3-15-17, Myokenzaka Katano-shi, Osaka 576 / JP | Representative(s) | Crawford, Andrew Birkby, et al A.A. Thornton & Co. 235 High Holborn London WC1V 7LE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1994/45] | Crawford, Andrew Birkby, et al A.A. THORNTON & CO. Northumberland House 303-306 High Holborn London WC1V 7LE / GB | Application number, filing date | 94303232.6 | 05.05.1994 | [1994/45] | Priority number, date | JP19930106569 | 07.05.1993 Original published format: JP 10656993 | [1994/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0623839 | Date: | 09.11.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0623839 | Date: | 21.01.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.08.1994 | Classification | IPC: | G03B21/10, G03B21/62 | [1994/45] | CPC: |
G03B21/02 (EP,US);
G03B21/10 (EP,US);
H04N9/3147 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1994/45] | Title | German: | Projektionsfernsehbildempfänger und seine Verwendung in einer Grossbildschirmvideoanzeigenvorrichtung | [1994/45] | English: | A projection type television receiver and its application in a large screen video display apparatus | [1994/45] | French: | Récepteur de télévision par projection et son application dans un appareil d'affichage d'image vidéo à grand écran | [1994/45] | Examination procedure | 04.01.1995 | Examination requested [1995/11] | 02.09.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.11.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.04.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 25.07.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.09.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 25.09.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.10.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.05.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.05.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US5206760 (NAKASHIMA AKIO [JP], et al) [X] 1-3,11-13,26,27 * column 1, line 19 - line 33 * * column 2, line 3 - line 16 * * column 3, line 41 - line 67 * * column A; figures 1,2,4A-6 * [A] 4-10,14-25,28; | [A]EP0523427 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1,11,20-26 * column 5, line 12 - line 57; figures 2,3,13 * |