EP0624651 - Xanthan gum from dairy permeates and other filtered dairy products [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.09.2002 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 30.10.2002 [2002/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SHIN-ETSU BIO, Inc. 6650 Lusk Boulevard San Diego California 92191 / US | For all designated states Shin-Etsu Chemical Co., Ltd. 6-1, Otemachi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1994/46] | For all designated states SHIN-ETSU BIO, Inc. 6650 Lusk Boulevard San Diego, California 92191 / US | ||
For all designated states Shin-Etsu Chemical Co., Ltd. 6-1, Otemachi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pollock, Thomas J. 1614 Torrance Street San Diego, California 92103 / US | 02 /
Armentrout, Richard W. 542 Rosemont Street La Jolla, California 92037 / US | [2001/22] |
Former [1994/46] | 01 /
Pollock, Thomas J. 4354 Robbins Street San Diego, California 92122 / US | ||
02 /
Armentrout, Richard W. 542 Rosemont Street La Jolla, California 92037 / US | Representative(s) | Bassett, Richard Simon, et al Potter Clarkson LLP The Belgrave Centre Talbot Street Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1994/46] | Bassett, Richard Simon, et al ERIC POTTER & CLARKSON St. Mary's Court St. Mary's Gate Nottingham NG1 1LE / GB | Application number, filing date | 94303376.1 | 11.05.1994 | [1994/46] | Priority number, date | US19930060403 | 11.05.1993 Original published format: US 60403 | [1994/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0624651 | Date: | 17.11.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0624651 | Date: | 07.11.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.09.1994 | Classification | IPC: | C12P19/06, C12N1/20, // (C12P19/06, C12R1:64) | [1994/46] | CPC: |
C12N15/52 (EP,US);
C12P19/06 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, FR, GB [1994/46] | Title | German: | Xanthangummi aus Milchpermeaten und anderen filtrierten Milchprodukten | [1994/46] | English: | Xanthan gum from dairy permeates and other filtered dairy products | [1994/46] | French: | Gomme de xanthane de perméates de lait et autres produits filtrés de lait | [1994/46] | Biological material | This application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details | Examination procedure | 20.05.1994 | Examination requested [1994/46] | 19.05.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.11.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.07.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.01.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.11.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 26.02.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 11.04.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.06.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 18.06.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.08.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.05.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.05.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.05.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]EP0287363 (SYNTRO CORP [US])[DA] 1-14; | [Y]EP0481785 (INTEVEP SA [VE], et al) [Y] 1-14; | [PY]US5288618 (HARDIN ROBERT S [US], et al) [PY] 1-14 | Examination | - Thorne et al (1998), J. Ind. Microbiol. 3, 321-328. |