EP0626776 - Data message storage and pick up service [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.02.2000 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.02.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 29.03.2000 [2000/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AT&T Corp. 32 Avenue of the Americas New York, NY 10013-2412 / US | [1994/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Chang, Edward S. 44 Wolf Hill Drive Warren, New Jersey 07059 / US | 02 /
Grasty, Nadine Kinsey 5 Maxwell Court Warren, New Jersey 07059 / US | 03 /
Gupta, Alok K. 22 Manor Drive Marlboro, New Jersey 07746 / US | 04 /
McNair, Bruce Edwin 1 Iron Hill Drive Holmdel, New Jersey 07733 / US | 05 /
Schwartz, Alan Ira 90 South Edgewood Road Bedminster, New Jersey 07921 / US | [1994/48] | Representative(s) | Harding, Richard Patrick, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 4220 Nash Court Oxford Business Park South Oxford OX4 2RU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/14] | Harding, Richard Patrick, et al Marks & Clerk, Nash Court, Oxford Business Park South Oxford OX4 2RU / GB | ||
Former [1998/02] | Harding, Richard Patrick, et al Marks & Clerk, Alpha Tower, Suffolk Street Queensway Birmingham B1 1TT / GB | ||
Former [1994/48] | Johnston, Kenneth Graham, et al AT&T (UK) Ltd. 5 Mornington Road Woodford Green Essex, IG8 OTU / GB | Application number, filing date | 94303530.3 | 18.05.1994 | [1994/48] | Priority number, date | US19930068359 | 27.05.1993 Original published format: US 68359 | [1994/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0626776 | Date: | 30.11.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0626776 | Date: | 07.04.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.08.1994 | Classification | IPC: | H04N1/32, H04N1/44 | [1994/48] | CPC: |
H04N1/32771 (EP,US);
H04N1/324 (EP,US);
H04N1/32432 (EP,US);
H04N1/4413 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB [1994/48] | Title | German: | Datensendungspeicherungs und -abrufdienst | [1994/48] | English: | Data message storage and pick up service | [1994/48] | French: | Service d'emmagasinage et de recherche de données de messages | [1994/48] | Examination procedure | 18.05.1995 | Examination requested [1995/29] | 02.06.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.10.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.06.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 08.10.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.10.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 28.10.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.01.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.05.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.05.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.05.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9221199 (BELL ATLANTIC NETWORK SERVICES [US]) [X] 1,3 * page 13, line 13 - page 15, line 6 *; | [Y]US5168371 (TAKAYANAGI HIROSHI [JP]) [Y] 1 * column 3, line 21 - line 50 *; | [A]EP0360732 (GORDON RICHARD J [US], et al) [A] 1,3,5-7 * column 4, line 34 - line 47 * * column 13, line 65 - column 16, line 14 *; | [A]JPS63211843 ; | [A]WO9103115 (COMPLETE PC [US]) [A] 1 * page 5, line 30 - page 7, line 29 * | [Y] - C. CHUNG ET AL, "IMPLEMENTATION OF A FAX DISTRIBUTION SYSTEM IN THE LOCAL AREA NETWORKS OF PCS", GLOBECOM'92,CONFERENCE RECORD, (19921209), vol. 2, pages 964 - 968, XP000357700 [Y] 1 * page 966 - page 967, paragraph 4 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/GLOCOM.1992.276381 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19881227), vol. 12, no. 500, Database accession no. (E - 699), & JP63211843 A 19880902 (NEC CORP) [A] 1 * abstract * |