EP0625462 - Liquefied gas ships [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.06.1997 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.06.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 13.08.1997 [1997/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ISHIKAWAJIMA-HARIMA JUKOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA No. 2-1, Ote-machi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo-to 100 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1994/47] | For all designated states ISHIKAWAJIMA-HARIMA JUKOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA No. 2-1, Ote-machi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo-to 100 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Aoki, Eiji No. 15-31-705, Higashi-machi, Isogo-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa-ken 235 / JP | 02 /
Yukitomo, Tatsuhiko No. 1-6-1606, Shiomi-dai, Isogo-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa-ken 235 / JP | 03 /
Yamada, Koichiro No. 6-18-3, Todoroki, Setagaya-ku Tokyo-to 158 / JP | [1994/47] | Representative(s) | Jennings, Nigel Robin, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1994/47] | Jennings, Nigel Robin, et al KILBURN & STRODE 30 John Street London WC1N 2DD / GB | Application number, filing date | 94303633.5 | 20.05.1994 | [1994/47] | Priority number, date | JP19930118499 | 20.05.1993 Original published format: JP 11849993 | JP19930126092 | 27.05.1993 Original published format: JP 12609293 | [1994/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0625462 | Date: | 23.11.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0625462 | Date: | 21.08.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.08.1994 | Classification | IPC: | B63B25/16, F17C13/12 | [1994/47] | CPC: |
B63B25/16 (EP,US);
F17C13/126 (EP,US);
F17C2203/0333 (EP,US);
F17C2203/035 (EP,US);
F17C2203/0354 (EP,US);
F17C2203/0631 (EP,US);
F17C2205/0323 (EP,US);
F17C2223/0153 (EP,US);
F17C2223/033 (EP,US);
F17C2250/072 (EP,US);
F17C2260/037 (EP,US);
F17C2260/038 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1994/47] | Title | German: | Flüssiggasschiffe | [1994/47] | English: | Liquefied gas ships | [1994/47] | French: | Bateaux à gas liquéfié | [1994/47] | Examination procedure | 02.12.1994 | Examination requested [1995/04] | 30.11.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 20.02.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.03.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 28.03.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.05.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.05.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4488500 (MOTOTSUNA KAZUMICHI [JP], et al) [A] 1 * column A; figure - *; | [A]JPS63279994 ; | [A]JPS6026900 ; | [A]US4106424 (SCHULER ALAN L, et al) [A] 1,7 * column 5, line 13 - line 33; figure - *; | [A]US4245748 (KVAMSDAL ROLF) [A] 1,7 * column 3, line 28 - line 51; figure - * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19890227), vol. 13, no. 83, Database accession no. (M - 802)<3431>, & JP63279994 A 19881117 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY INDUSTRIES LTD.) [A] 1 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19850625), vol. 9, no. 149, Database accession no. (M - 390)<1872>, & JP60026900 A 19850209 (K.MOTOZUNA) [A] 1 * abstract * |