EP0626672 - Method and apparatus for displaying half tones in a ferroelectric liquid crystal display with scanning in units of bands [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.10.1999 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 30.01.2008 [2008/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1994/48] | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Aratani, Shuntaro, c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Ohshima, Masamichi, c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Suga, Kazumi, c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | [1994/48] | Representative(s) | Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis, et al Beresford Crump LLP 16 High Holborn London WC1V 6BX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1994/48] | Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis, et al BERESFORD & Co. 2-5 Warwick Court High Holborn London WC1R 5DJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 94303710.1 | 24.05.1994 | [1994/48] | Priority number, date | JP19930122502 | 25.05.1993 Original published format: JP 12250293 | JP19930122501 | 25.05.1993 Original published format: JP 12250193 | [1994/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0626672 | Date: | 30.11.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/48] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0626672 | Date: | 08.03.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0626672 | Date: | 09.12.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.01.1995 | Classification | IPC: | G09G3/36, H04N1/40 | [1994/48] | CPC: |
G09G3/3629 (EP,US);
H04N1/4052 (EP,US);
G09G2310/04 (EP,US);
G09G3/2059 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1994/48] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Einrichtung zum Anzeigen von Halbtönen in einer ferroelektrischen Flüssigkristallanzeige mit Abtastung in Streifeneinheiten | [1994/48] | English: | Method and apparatus for displaying half tones in a ferroelectric liquid crystal display with scanning in units of bands | [1994/48] | French: | Méthode et appareil pour afficher des demi-teintes dans un affichage à cristaux liquides ferroélectriques avec balayage par unités de bandes | [1994/49] |
Former [1994/48] | Méthode et appareil pour afficher des demi-teintes dasn un affichage à cristaux liquides ferroélectriques avec balayage par unités de bandes | Examination procedure | 21.07.1995 | Examination requested [1995/38] | 28.04.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.11.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.02.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 15.06.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.08.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 20.08.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.09.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.05.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.05.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.05.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 09.12.1998 | IT | 09.12.1998 | SE | 09.03.1999 | [2008/05] |
Former [2002/26] | ES | 09.12.1998 | |
SE | 09.03.1999 | ||
Former [2001/23] | SE | 09.03.1999 | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]EP0537428 (CANON KK [JP]) [Y] 1-3,18-20,24 * Abstract *; column 21, line 14 - column 22, line 29; figures 18-20 * [A] 8,9,13,14; | [YA]EP0395404 (CANON KK [JP]) [Y] 7,10,22 * Abstract *; page 2, line 13 - page 3, line 21; figure 1B * * page 5, line 53 - page 7, line 6 * [A] 4,5,21; | [YA]EP0295105 (CANON KK [JP]) [Y] 12,23 * Abstract *; column 1, line 54 - column 3, line 34; figures 1A-3C * * column 5, line 55 - column 6, line 22 * [A] 6; | [PX]EP0591683 (CANON KK [JP]) [PX] 24 * Abstract *; page 10, line 35 - page 13, line 24; figures 15A-25 *; | [PX]EP0592801 (CANON KK [JP]) [PX] 24 * Abstract *; page 6, line 5 - page 7, line 30; figures 3A-5,9 *; | [PX]EP0570906 (CANON KK [JP]) [PX] 1,2,18,19 * Abstract *; column 13, line 16 - column 15, line 7; figures 12-15 * | [Y] - "Halftoning Method for Mosaic Color Displays Using Error Diffusion", IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN., NEW YORK US, (198910), vol. 32, no. 5A, pages 194 - 197 [Y] 1-3,7,10,12,18-20,22-24 * Whole article * |