EP0626602 - Ferrule structure for optical fiber connector [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.04.1999 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.04.1999 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.06.1999 [1999/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NEC Corporation 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1994/48] | For all designated states NEC CORPORATION 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ueda, Tetsuji, c/o NEC Corporation 7-1, Shiba 5-Chome, Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [1994/48] | Representative(s) | Cozens, Paul Dennis, et al Mathys & Squire The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1994/48] | Cozens, Paul Dennis, et al Mathys & Squire 100 Grays Inn Road London WC1X 8AL / GB | Application number, filing date | 94303856.2 | 27.05.1994 | [1994/48] | Priority number, date | JP19930126807 | 28.05.1993 Original published format: JP 12680793 | [1994/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0626602 | Date: | 30.11.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.10.1994 | Classification | IPC: | G02B6/38 | [1994/48] | CPC: |
G02B6/3846 (EP,US);
G02B6/3888 (EP,US);
G02B6/3854 (EP,US);
G02B6/3861 (EP,US);
G02B6/3869 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1994/48] | Title | German: | Aufnahme für einen optischen Faserstecker | [1994/48] | English: | Ferrule structure for optical fiber connector | [1994/48] | French: | Structure d'embout d'un connecteur à fibre optique | [1994/48] | Examination procedure | 21.10.1994 | Examination requested [1995/05] | 29.03.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.10.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.07.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.11.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.08.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.12.1998 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1999/24] | 21.01.1999 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1999/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.05.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.05.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.05.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS6042718 ; | [A]JPS58152215 ; | [A]WO8707035 (AMP INC [US]) [A] 1,6 * abstract *; | [A]EP0374939 (NEC CORP [JP]) [A] 1,8,9 * abstract *; | [A]EP0517346 (AMP INC [US]) [A] 1,8-10 * page 5, lines 31-42; figure - *; | [AX] - K.KURATA ET AL., "A New Quick Field Installable Single Mode Optical Fiber Connector", NEC RESEARCH AND DEVELOPMENT, TOKYO JP, (199101), vol. 32, no. 1, pages 61 - 68, XP000229421 [A] 1,7 * page 62 * * page 62 * [X] 9,10 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19850712), vol. 9, no. 167, Database accession no. (P - 372), & JP60042718 A 00000000 (HAKUSAN SEISAKUSHO) [A] 1 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19831207), vol. 7, no. 274, Database accession no. (P - 241), & JP58152215 A 19830909 (KOGYO GIJUTSIN) [A] 4 * abstract * |