EP0627583 - Diaphragm valve [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.02.1999 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.02.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.04.1999 [1999/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kiyohara, Masako 408, Yamamuro Shimizu-cho Kumamoto-shi Kumamoto-ken / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1994/49] | For all designated states Kiyohara, Masako 408, Yamamuro Shimizu-cho Kumamoto-shi Kumamoto-ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Itoi, Shigeru, c/o Fujikin Incorporated 2-3-2, Itachibori, Kishi-ku Osaka / JP | 02 /
Yamaji, Michio, c/o Fujikin Incorporated 2-3-2, Itachibori, Kishi-ku Osaka / JP | 03 /
Kojima, Tetsuya, c/o Fujikin Incorporated 2-3-2, Itachibori, Kishi-ku Osaka / JP | [1994/49] | Representative(s) | Smith, Norman Ian, et al Cleveland 40-43 Chancery Lane London WC2A 1JQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1994/49] | Smith, Norman Ian, et al F.J. CLEVELAND & COMPANY 40-43 Chancery Lane London WC2A 1JQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 94303959.4 | 02.06.1994 | [1994/49] | Priority number, date | JP19930131939 | 02.06.1993 Original published format: JP 13193993 | [1994/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0627583 | Date: | 07.12.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/49] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0627583 | Date: | 22.03.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0627583 | Date: | 15.04.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.02.1995 | Classification | IPC: | F16K7/16 | [1994/49] | CPC: |
F16K7/16 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1994/49] | Title | German: | Membranventil | [1994/49] | English: | Diaphragm valve | [1994/49] | French: | Soupape à diaphragme | [1994/49] | Examination procedure | 09.07.1994 | Examination requested [1994/49] | 24.05.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.09.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.10.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.02.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.08.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 17.10.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.11.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 10.11.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.01.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.06.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.06.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US5108069 (TADA KOUKI [JP], et al) [X] 1 * abstract * [A] 17; | [XA]US4741510 (BAUMANN HANS D [US]) [X] 1 * column 1, line 42 - line 43; figure 1 * * column 2, line 2 - line 3 * [A] 16,17; | [A]EP0530947 (KYOHARA MASAKO [JP]) [A] 1,8,17 * column 3, line 19 - line 38; figure 2 *; | [A]DE1152583 (MOORE) [A] 1,2,4,5,9-12,15 * figures 1,2 *; | [A]EP0190414 (REGEL MESSTECHNIK GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-6,9-15 * figure 1 *; | [A]US4846215 (BARREE ROBERT D [US]) [A] 1-8,10,16,17 * figures 6-8; claim 2 *; | [A]US2856148 (KENNETH HEATHCOTE, et al) [A] 1,3,6 * figure 1 *; | [A]GB320778 (PHILIP KEITH SAUNDERS) [A] 1,2 * figure 1 *; | [A]GB1462176 (FORDHAM PRESSINGS LTD) [A] 1 * figure 1 * |