EP0687949 - Teremp fabric [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.02.2000 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.02.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 12.04.2000 [2000/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Milliken & Company 920 Milliken Road Spartanburg, SC 29304 / US | [1999/37] |
Former [1995/51] | For all designated states MILLIKEN RESEARCH CORPORATION Post Office Box 1927 Spartanburg South Carolina 29304 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lesley, Bascum Gregory 108 Heritage Drive Picken, SC 29671, Pickens / US | [1995/51] | Representative(s) | Pacitti, Pierpaolo Alfonso, et al Murgitroyd and Company 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1995/51] | Pacitti, Pierpaolo A.M.E., et al Murgitroyd and Company 373 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8QA / GB | Application number, filing date | 94304429.7 | 17.06.1994 | [1995/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0687949 | Date: | 20.12.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0687949 | Date: | 21.04.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.02.1995 | Classification | IPC: | G03C3/00, D04B21/02, G03B17/30 | [1995/51] | CPC: |
D04B21/02 (EP);
G03B17/26 (EP);
G03C3/00 (EP);
G03B2217/265 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, DK, FR, GB, IT, NL [1995/51] | Title | German: | Plüschgewebe | [1995/51] | English: | Teremp fabric | [1995/51] | French: | Tissu bouclé | [1995/51] | Examination procedure | 09.01.1996 | Examination requested [1996/11] | 23.08.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.12.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.08.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.12.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.07.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 20.10.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.01.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 18.01.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.01.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.04.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.03.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.03.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.03.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5275283 (M.AKAO) [X] 1-5 * column 5, line 11 - line 24 * * column 5, line 63 - line 65; figure 1 * * column 6, line 8 - line 24; figures 4,6 *; | [X]EP0452900 (FUJI PHOTO FILM) [X] 1-5 * page 7, line 16 - line 54; figures 1-4; examples 1,6 *; | [A]EP0440240 (FUJI PHOTO FILM); | [A]EP0466192 (FUJI PHOTO FILM) |