EP0634239 - Vacuum casting method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.04.1999 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.04.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.05.1999 [1999/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1998/23] | For all designated states TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho, Toyota-shi Aichi-ken 471-8571 / JP | ||
Former [1995/03] | For all designated states TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi Aichi-ken 471 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hasegawa, Tamotsu, c/o Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki K. 1 Toyota-cho, Toyota-shi Aichi-ken, 471 / JP | 02 /
Arakawa, Yasuyuki, c/o Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki K. 1 Toyota-cho, Toyota-shi Aichi-ken, 471 / JP | 03 /
Ota, Atushi c/o Toyota Jidosha K.K., 1 Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken 471 / JP | [1995/03] | Representative(s) | Ben-Nathan, Laurence Albert, et al Urquhart-Dykes & Lord 30 Welbeck Street London W1G 8ER / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1995/03] | Ben-Nathan, Laurence Albert, et al Urquhart-Dykes & Lord 91 Wimpole Street London W1M 8AH / GB | Application number, filing date | 94304448.7 | 20.06.1994 | [1995/03] | Priority number, date | JP19930160789 | 30.06.1993 Original published format: JP 16078993 | [1995/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0634239 | Date: | 18.01.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0634239 | Date: | 03.06.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.11.1994 | Classification | IPC: | B22D18/06 | [1995/03] | CPC: |
B22D18/06 (EP,KR,US);
B22D18/08 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1995/03] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Vakuumdruckgiessen | [1995/03] | English: | Vacuum casting method | [1995/03] | French: | Procédé de coulée sous vide | [1995/03] | Examination procedure | 28.06.1994 | Examination requested [1995/03] | 31.10.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 04.12.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.01.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 02.01.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.03.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.06.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.06.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [PDA]JPH05192759 ; | [PA]EP0559920 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [PA] 1-7 * the whole document *; | [A]WO9307977 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-7; | [A]JPH02155557 ; | [A]JPH05123845 ; | [A]JPH0331058U (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP.) [A] 1-7 * figure - *; | [A]JPH0368955U (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP.) [A] 1-7 * figure - * | [PDA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19931115), vol. 17, no. 618, Database accession no. (M - 1510), & JP05192759 A 19930803 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP) [PDA] 1-7 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19900904), vol. 14, no. 407, Database accession no. (M - 1019), & JP02155557 A 19900614 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP) [A] 1-7 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19930907), vol. 17, no. 493, Database accession no. (M - 1475), & JP05123845 A 19930521 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP) [A] 1-7 * abstract * |