EP0634202 - High aspect ratio triple-plus warp wire mesh [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.11.2000 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.11.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 20.12.2000 [2000/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cagle, William S. 7021 E. 77th Place Tulsa Oklahoma 74133 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1995/03] | For all designated states Cagle, William S. 7021 E. 77th Place Tulsa, Oklahoma 74133 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1995/03] | Representative(s) | Gilding, Martin John Eric Potter Clarkson, Park View House, 58 The Ropewalk Nottingham NG1 5DD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1995/03] | Gilding, Martin John Eric Potter & Clarkson St. Mary's Court St. Mary's Gate Nottingham NG1 1LE / GB | Application number, filing date | 94304515.3 | 21.06.1994 | [1995/03] | Priority number, date | US19930092017 | 15.07.1993 Original published format: US 92017 | [1995/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0634202 | Date: | 18.01.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/03] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0634202 | Date: | 23.08.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0634202 | Date: | 05.01.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.07.1995 | Classification | IPC: | B01D39/12, B07B1/46, B01D39/08 | [1995/33] | CPC: |
B01D39/12 (EP,US);
B01D39/10 (KR)
|
Former IPC [1995/03] | B01D39/12, B07B1/46 | Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, NL [1995/03] | Title | German: | Drahtsgewebe mit drei oder mehr Kettfäden und einem hohen Längenverhältnis | [1995/03] | English: | High aspect ratio triple-plus warp wire mesh | [1995/03] | French: | Treillis à trois fils de chaîne ou plus et ayant un rapport d'élancement élevé | [1995/03] | Examination procedure | 14.02.1996 | Examination requested [1996/15] | 26.01.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.07.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.03.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 08.07.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.10.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 07.10.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.10.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.06.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.06.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.06.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3716138 (LUMSDEN A) [A] 1-9 * column 3, line 49 - column 4, line 43 * * figures 6,10,11 *; | [A]US4107371 (DEAN WILLIAM BRUCE) [A] 1-9 * column A * * column 2, line 4 - line 56 * * figure -; claim - *; | [A]US2024806 (DISBRO ROGER W, et al) [A] 1-9 * column 1, line 37 - column 2, line 34 * * column 2, line 50 - column 3, line 4 * * figures 1,2 *; | [A]DE195888 (RICHARD PHILIPP) [A] 1-9 * sentence 37 - sentence 54 * * figure 6 *; | [A]EP0134604 (BEKAERT SA NV [BE]) [A] 1-9 * abstract * * page 3, line 21 - page 4, line 25 * * figure 1; example . *; | [A] - S.E.GLUCK, "VIBRATING SCREENS: Surface Selection And Capacity Calculation", CHEMICAL ENGINEERING, NEW YORK US, (19650315), vol. 72, no. 6, pages 179 - 184, XP001274646 [A] 1,2,8,9 * page 181, column L, paragraph 6 - column R, paragraph 5 * |