EP0631380 - Sequential amplifier [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.08.2000 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.08.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.10.2000 [2000/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states RF MONOLITHICS, INC. 4441 Sigma Road Dallas Texas 75244 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1999/37] | For all designated states RF MONOLITHICS, INC. 4441 Sigma Road Dallas, Texas 75244 / US | ||
Former [1994/52] | For all designated states R.F. MONOLITHICS, INC. 4441 Sigma Road Dallas Texas 75244 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ash, Darrel L. 1707 Cartwright Sachse, Texas 75048 / US | [1994/52] | Representative(s) | Brunner, Michael John Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1994/52] | Brunner, Michael John GILL JENNINGS & EVERY Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 94304577.3 | 23.06.1994 | [1994/52] | Priority number, date | US19930081802 | 23.06.1993 Original published format: US 81802 | [1994/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0631380 | Date: | 28.12.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0631380 | Date: | 20.10.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.10.1994 | Classification | IPC: | H03F1/08, H03F3/19, H04R3/02 | [1994/52] | CPC: |
H03F3/605 (EP,US);
H03F3/189 (KR);
H03F1/083 (EP,US);
H04B1/24 (EP,US);
H04R3/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1994/52] | Title | German: | Verstärker mit sequentieller Wirkungsweise | [1994/52] | English: | Sequential amplifier | [1994/52] | French: | Amplificateur à fonctionnement séquentiel | [1994/52] | Examination procedure | 26.04.1995 | Examination requested [1995/26] | 12.08.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.11.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.12.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 29.03.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 13.04.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.06.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 23.06.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.07.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.06.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.06.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.06.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS62241497 ; | [A]US5053720 (MIZUMOTO TORU [JP]) [A] 1 * column A *; | [A]US3892983 (OKADA TAKASHI, et al) [A] 1 * column A * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19880408), vol. 12, no. 111, Database accession no. (E - 598), & JP62241497 A 00000000 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC) [A] 1,9,14,15 * abstract * |