EP0631298 - A method for the production of semiconductor epitaxial substrate [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1994/52] | Semiconductor epitaxial substrate and process for its production | ||
[1999/42] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.06.2001 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.06.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.08.2001 [2001/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SUMITOMO CHEMICAL COMPANY LIMITED 5-33, Kitahama 4-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 541-0041 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2000/35] | For all designated states SUMITOMO CHEMICAL COMPANY LIMITED 5-33, Kitahama 4-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 541-0041 / JP | ||
Former [1994/52] | For all designated states SUMITOMO CHEMICAL COMPANY LIMITED 5-33, Kitahama 4-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 541 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hata, Masahiko 1-12-19-205, Ninomiya Tsukuba-shi, Ibaraki / JP | 02 /
Fukuhara, Noboru 3-18-5-104, Matsushiro Tsukuba-shi, Ibaraki / JP | 03 /
Takata, Hiroaki 2-13-10-206, Amakubo Tsukuba-shi, Ibaraki / JP | 04 /
Inui, Katsumi 2-40-1-216, Kasuga Tsukuba-shi, Ibaraki / JP | [1994/52] | Representative(s) | Dixon, Donald Cossar, et al Wilson Gunn Gee Chancery House Chancery Lane London WC2A 1QU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1996/13] | Dixon, Donald Cossar, et al Gee & Co. Chancery House Chancery Lane London WC2A 1QU / GB | ||
Former [1994/52] | Moore, Anthony John, et al Gee & Co. Chancery House Chancery Lane London WC2A 1QU / GB | Application number, filing date | 94304696.1 | 28.06.1994 | [1994/52] | Priority number, date | JP19930156850 | 28.06.1993 Original published format: JP 15685093 | [1994/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0631298 | Date: | 28.12.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/52] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0631298 | Date: | 01.03.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0631298 | Date: | 30.08.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.01.1995 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/203, H01L29/80 | [1995/07] | CPC: |
H01L21/02395 (EP,US);
H01L21/20 (KR);
H01L21/02433 (EP,US);
H01L21/02463 (EP,US);
H01L21/02546 (EP,US);
H01L21/02576 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [1994/52] | H01L21/203 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1994/52] | Title | German: | Ein Verfahren zur Herstellung eines epitaktischen Halbleitersubstrats | [1999/42] | English: | A method for the production of semiconductor epitaxial substrate | [1999/42] | French: | Procédé de fabrication d'un substrat semi-conducteur épitaxial | [1999/42] |
Former [1994/52] | Epitaktisches Halbleitersubstrat und Verfahren zu seiner Herstellung | ||
Former [1994/52] | Semiconductor epitaxial substrate and process for its production | ||
Former [1994/52] | Substrat semi-conducteur épitaxial et procédé pour sa fabrication | Examination procedure | 02.05.1995 | Examination requested [1995/26] | 09.09.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.03.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.11.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.03.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.10.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 02.03.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.05.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 29.05.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 31.05.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.06.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.06.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.06.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4827320 (MORKOC HADIS [US], et al) [Y] 1-4; | [A]WO9113466 (VARIAN ASSOCIATES [US]) [A] 1,5; | [A]EP0539693 (ROHM CO LTD [JP])[A] 1,5 | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN [Y] 1-4 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN [A] 5-8 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN [A] 1-4 | Examination | US5162243 |