EP0632619 - Collision reduction method for ethernet network [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.08.2001 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 30.01.2008 [2008/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CABLETRON SYSTEMS, INC. 35 Industrial Way Rochester, NH 03867 / US | [2000/17] |
Former [1995/01] | For all designated states DIGITAL EQUIPMENT CORPORATION 146 Main Street Maynard, MA 01754 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yang, Henry Sho-Che 11 Dascomb Road Andover, Massachusetts 01810 / US | 02 /
Ramakrishnan, Kadangode K. 11 Michael Road Maynard, Massachusetts 01754 / US | 03 /
Hawe, William R. 16 Independence Road Pepperell, Massachusetts 01463 / US | 04 /
Lauck, Anthony G. 20 Fells Circle Wellesley, Massachusetts 02181 / US | [1995/01] | Representative(s) | Goodman, Christopher, et al Eric Potter Clarkson, Park View House, 58 The Ropewalk Nottingham NG1 5DD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1995/01] | Goodman, Christopher, et al Eric Potter & Clarkson St. Mary's Court St. Mary's Gate Nottingham NG1 1LE / GB | Application number, filing date | 94304722.5 | 28.06.1994 | [1995/01] | Priority number, date | US19930085856 | 30.06.1993 Original published format: US 85856 | [1995/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0632619 | Date: | 04.01.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/01] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0632619 | Date: | 16.08.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0632619 | Date: | 18.10.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.06.1995 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/40 | [1995/01] | CPC: |
H04L12/413 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1995/01] | Title | German: | Kollisionverminderungsverfahren für Ethernet-Netze | [1995/01] | English: | Collision reduction method for ethernet network | [1995/01] | French: | Procédé pour la réduction de collisions dans un réseau Ethernet | [1995/01] | Examination procedure | 01.09.1995 | Examination requested [1995/44] | 17.11.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 20.03.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 30.03.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.05.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 26.05.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.07.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.09.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.05.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.05.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.1996 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   16.09.1996 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 18.10.2000 | [2008/05] | Documents cited: | Search | [A] - C.H. YOON ET AL., "Unslotted CSMA/CD protocols with combined retransmission strategy for fiber optic bus and ring networks.", COMPUTER NETWORKS AND ISDN SYSTEMS, AMSTERDAM,NL, vol. 21, no. 5, doi:doi:10.1016/0169-7552(91)90010-A, pages 381 - 397, XP000215759 [A] 1-6 * abstract * * page 386, column R, line 12 - line 28 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0169-7552(91)90010-A | [A] - Y. LIU ET AL., "Performance of CSMA/CD protocol for Local Area Networks.", IEEE JOURNAL ON SELECTED AREAS IN COMMUNICATION, NEW YORK US, vol. sac-5, no. 6, pages 948 - 955 [A] 1-6 * page 948, column R, line 37 - page 949, column L, line 35 * | [A] - C. TROPPER, "On retransmission protocols for ETHERNET", INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON COMMUNICATIONS, USA, vol. 2, pages 777 - 780 [A] 1-6 * page 779, column L, line 9 - column R, line 21 * |