EP0636402 - Method of pretreating a porous medium [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.07.2000 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.08.2000 [2000/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PALL CORPORATION 2200 Northern Blvd. East Hills, New York 11548 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1995/05] | For all designated states Pall Corporation 2200 Northern Blvd. East Hills, New York 11548 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dehn, Joseph W. 52 Berkshire Road Great Neck, New York 11023 / US | 02 /
Degen, Peter John 24 Glades Way Huntington, New York 11743 / US | 03 /
Alex, Tony 58 Henderson Road Kendall Park, New Jersey 08824 / US | 04 /
Gildersleeve, Michael R. 18 Rolling Hills Drive Nesconset, New York 11767 / US | [1995/05] | Representative(s) | Knott, Stephen Gilbert, et al Mathisen & Macara LLP Communications House South Street Staines-upon-Thames Middlesex, TW18 4PR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1995/05] | Knott, Stephen Gilbert, et al MATHISEN, MACARA & CO. The Coach House 6-8 Swakeleys Road Ickenham Uxbridge Middlesex UB10 8BZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 94305045.0 | 08.07.1994 | [1995/05] | Priority number, date | US19930097437 | 26.07.1993 Original published format: US 97437 | [1995/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0636402 | Date: | 01.02.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/05] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0636402 | Date: | 08.02.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.12.1994 | Classification | IPC: | B01D67/00, B01D39/00, B01D61/14, A23C9/142, C12H1/06, B01D65/08 | [1995/06] | CPC: |
B01D67/0088 (EP,US);
A23C9/1422 (EP,US);
B01D61/147 (EP,US);
B01D65/08 (EP,US);
C12H1/063 (EP,US);
B01D2321/28 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1995/05] | B01D67/00, B01D39/00, B01D61/14 | Designated contracting states | CH, DE, DK, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1995/05] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Vorbehandlung eines porösen Mediums | [1995/05] | English: | Method of pretreating a porous medium | [1995/05] | French: | Procédé de prétraitement d'un milieu poreux | [1995/05] | Examination procedure | 12.07.1995 | Examination requested [1995/36] | 18.01.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.05.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.02.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.08.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.02.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2000/34] | 21.03.2000 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2000/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.07.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.07.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.07.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.1999 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE3043073 (FRESENIUS CHEM PHARM IND [DE]) [X] 1,3-5,8-13,16,17 * claims 1,4,5,10,13,14 * * page 4, line 1 - page 5, line 1 * * page 9, line 7 * * page 12, line 1 - line 4 * * page 12, line 28 - page 13, line 4 * * example 2 *; | [A]JPS5575706 ; | [A]WO9314181 (OLIN CORP [US]) [A] 1-4,10,11 * abstract * * page 1, line 1 - line 13 * * page 4, line 9 - page 5, line 29 * * page 8, line 26 - page 9, line 12 * * examples 2,6 *; | [A]US4983291 (CHAU MICHAEL M [US], et al) [A] 1,2,5,6,10-15 * abstract * * column 7, line 3 - line 27 * * column 8, line 8 *; | [X] - DUMON S., "Ultrafiltration of protein solutions on ZrO2 membranes", JOURNAL OF MEMBRANE SCIENCE, AMSTERDAM, NL, (1992), vol. 74, doi:doi:10.1016/0376-7388(92)80068-U, pages 289 - 302, XP000362046 [X] 1-8,10-16 * abstract * * page 289, column 1, paragraph 1 * * page 291, column 2 * * page 297, column 2, paragraph L * * page 299, column 2, line 10 - line 13 * * page 300, column 2, line 19 - page 301, column 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0376-7388(92)80068-U | [A] - MULDER M., Basic Principles of Membrane Technology, DORDRECHT, NL, KLUWER, (1990) [A] 1,5-8 * page 207, paragraph L * * page 208, paragraph L - page 209, paragraph 1 * * page 209, line 24 * * page 212, paragraph 2 - paragraph 4 * * page 309, paragraph 4 * | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 80, no. 30, Database accession no. 80-52124C, & JPS5575706 A 19800607 (SANYO KOKUSAKU PULP) [A] 1-5 * abstract * | [ ] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19800823), vol. 4, no. 119, Database accession no. (C - 022) [ ] * abstract * | [A] - HEINEMANN P., "Microfiltration of Protein Solutions: Effect of Fouling on Rejection", DESALINATION, AMSTERDAM, NL, (1988), vol. 68, pages 243 - 250, XP001283691 |