EP0635547 - Reduced gloss, flame retarded, high impact thermoplastic composition [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.08.1996 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.1996 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.09.1996 [1996/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1995/04] | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bhatia, Qamar Singh 40 Johnston Road Albany, New York 12203 / US | 02 /
Howe, Robert L. RR 1 Box 443 Greenville, New York 12082 / US | [1995/04] | Representative(s) | Szary, Anne Catherine, et al GPO Europe GE International Inc. The Ark 201 Talgarth Road Hammersmith London W6 8BJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1996/30] | Szary, Anne Catherine, et al London Patent Operation, GE Technical Services Co. Inc., Essex House, 12-13 Essex Street London WC2R 3AA / GB | ||
Former [1995/04] | Pratt, Richard Wilson, et al London Patent Operation G.E. Technical Services Co. Inc. Essex House 12/13 Essex Street London WC2R 3AA / GB | Application number, filing date | 94305143.3 | 13.07.1994 | [1995/04] | Priority number, date | US19930097341 | 23.07.1993 Original published format: US 97341 | [1995/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0635547 | Date: | 25.01.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/04] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0635547 | Date: | 10.05.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.03.1995 | Classification | IPC: | C08L69/00 | [1995/04] | CPC: |
C08L69/00 (EP);
C08L25/12 (EP);
C08L27/18 (EP);
C08L51/00 (EP);
C08L55/02 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C08L69/00, C08L2666/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL [1995/04] | Title | German: | Flammwidrige, schlagzähe thermoplastische Zusammensetzungen mit reduziertem Glanz | [1995/04] | English: | Reduced gloss, flame retarded, high impact thermoplastic composition | [1995/04] | French: | Compositions thermoplastiques, ignifuges et résistantes aux chocs, à brillance réduite | [1995/04] | File destroyed: | 13.09.2003 | Examination procedure | 12.12.1995 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1996/38] | 15.04.1996 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1996/38] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [PA]EP0561512 (GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY) [PA] 1-4 * claims 1-26 *; | [A]EP0483628 (BASF AG) [A] 1,7-10 * claim 1 *; | [A]WO9107466 (GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY) [A] 1 * claims 1-20 *; | [D]US5026777 (JALBERT R. L.); | [A]US4148842 (YU ET AL.); | [A]US4868244 (O. M. BOUTNI) |