EP0634685 - Liquid crystal display device and method for producing the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.03.2005 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 13.08.2008 [2008/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 22-22 Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku Osaka-shi Osaka-fu 545-0013 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2004/21] | For all designated states SHARP KABUSHIKI KAISHA 22-22 Nagaike-cho, Abeno-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka-fu 545-0013 / JP | ||
Former [1995/03] | For all designated states SHARP KABUSHIKI KAISHA 22-22 Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku Osaka 545 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yamada, Nobuaki 4-16, Kashitahon-machi Higashiosaka-shi, Osaka / JP | 02 /
Nagae, Nobukazu 2613-1, Ichinomoto-cho Tenri-shi, Nara-ken / JP | 03 /
Onishi, Noriaki 268-4, Fujiwara-cho Nara-shi, Nara-ken / JP | 04 /
Kozaki, Shuichi 5-9-29-203, Ukyo Nara-shi, Nara-ken / JP | 05 /
Okamoto, Masayuki Sharp Akebono-ryo, 2613-1, Ichinomoto-cho Tenri-shi, Nara-ken / JP | 06 /
Yamahara, Motohiro 13-21-1102, Karahori-cho, Tennoji-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka / JP | 07 /
Masahiko, Kondo 1-11-6, Kataoka-dai, Kanmaki-cho Kitakatsuragi-gun, Nara-ken / JP | 08 /
Horie, Wataru 1026, Mukasoi Hashimoto-shi, Wakayama-ken / JP | [1995/03] | Representative(s) | Suckling, Andrew Michael, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 2nd Floor, Wytham Court 11 West Way Oxford OX2 0JB / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Suckling, Andrew Michael, et al Marks & Clerk 4220 Nash Court Oxford Business Park South Oxford Oxfordshire OX4 2RU / GB | ||
Former [1998/37] | Suckling, Andrew Michael, et al Marks & Clerk, Nash Court, Oxford Business Park South Oxford OX4 2RU / GB | ||
Former [1995/03] | White, Martin David, et al MARKS & CLERK, 57/60 Lincoln's Inn Fields London WC2A 3LS / GB | Application number, filing date | 94305149.0 | 14.07.1994 | [1995/03] | Priority number, date | JP19930199285 | 15.07.1993 Original published format: JP 19928593 | JP19930216700 | 31.08.1993 Original published format: JP 21670093 | JP19930338706 | 28.12.1993 Original published format: JP 33870693 | [1995/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0634685 | Date: | 18.01.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/03] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0634685 | Date: | 27.09.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0634685 | Date: | 19.05.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.08.1995 | Classification | IPC: | G02F1/1333, G02F1/1337 | [1995/03] | CPC: |
G02F1/133377 (EP,US);
G02F1/133 (KR);
G02F1/133753 (EP,US);
G02F1/133707 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1995/03] | Title | German: | Flüssigkristallanzeigevorrichtung und Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung | [1995/03] | English: | Liquid crystal display device and method for producing the same | [1995/03] | French: | Dispositif d'affichage à cristal liquide et son procédé de fabrication | [1995/03] | Examination procedure | 02.01.1996 | Examination requested [1996/10] | 17.05.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.11.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.01.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.05.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.12.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.04.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.11.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.03.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 10.03.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.02.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.07.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.07.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.07.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.07.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 12.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 14.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4295712 (ISHIWATARI MASUMI) [A] 1,19,30 * column W *; | [PXA]EP0568355 (SHARP KK [JP]) [PX] 19-21,29 * page 33, line 17 - page 34, line 09 * [PA] 1,30 |